USA v. West et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00118 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/21/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
229
05/21/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
230
05/21/2018
Notice (Other)
231
05/21/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
232
05/22/2018
Summons Returned Executed
05/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
237
06/29/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
06/29/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
239
06/29/2018
Order of Detention
07/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
243
07/17/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
244
07/25/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
245
07/25/2018
Unopposed Motion
246
07/25/2018
Declaration
08/06/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.