USA v. West
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00181 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
22
05/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
23
05/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
24
05/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
25
05/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
26
05/29/2018
Notice (Other)
27
05/30/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
05/31/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
05/31/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
30
06/18/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
06/19/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
06/21/2018
Judgment
34
06/21/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
35
06/29/2018
Forfeiture of Property
36
06/29/2018
Affidavit
37
07/05/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
38
07/31/2018
Notice (Other)
07/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
08/15/2018
Amended Judgment
42
08/15/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.