USA v. White
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2007-cr-00136-6507 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
287
01/09/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
288
01/15/2019
Response in Opposition
289
01/18/2019
Reply to Response
290
02/22/2019
Order
291
02/28/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
03/12/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
294
03/21/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
04/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
296
04/12/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
297
04/12/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
298
04/12/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
299
04/12/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
300
05/06/2019
Order
301
05/06/2019
Order/Judgment Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.