USA v. White
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00165 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
18
09/04/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
19
09/11/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
20
09/11/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
21
09/11/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
22
09/11/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
09/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
09/11/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
26
09/20/2018
Transcript - SEALED
27
09/20/2018
Transcript
28
09/26/2018
Sentencing
29
09/26/2018
Witness List Public Doc
31
09/26/2018
Witness List
32
10/03/2018
Judgment
33
10/03/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.