USA v. Williams et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2009-cr-00027 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
948
05/22/2018
Violation Disposition Report
949
05/24/2018
USCA Order
950
05/25/2018
Notice (Other)
05/29/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
951
05/25/2018
Notice (Other)
953
06/12/2018
Judgment on Revocation
954
06/12/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
955
06/18/2018
USCA Order
956
07/11/2018
USCA Mandate
957
07/13/2018
Returned/Undeliverable Mail
09/14/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
USPO Report re: Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
963
09/24/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
964
09/24/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
965
09/24/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
966
09/24/2018
Notice (Other)
09/24/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
968
09/24/2018
Notice (Other)
969
09/24/2018
Order of Detention
970
10/18/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
10/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
972
10/22/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
973
10/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
974
10/31/2018
Affidavit
11/01/2018
Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.