USA v. Williams et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00049 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
195
06/11/2018
Response to Order to Show Cause
196
06/13/2018
Notice (Other)
197
06/26/2018
Notice of Change of Address
198
07/25/2018
Supplement
199
08/01/2018
Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)
200
08/03/2018
Order
201
08/31/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
202
09/04/2018
USCA Case Number
12/11/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
205
12/11/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
206
12/11/2018
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.