USA v. Williams et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00079-60444 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
07/25/2018
Pretrial Services Report
07/25/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/26/2018
Pretrial Services Report
07/27/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
07/27/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
11
07/27/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
12
07/27/2018
Order of Detention
07/27/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
07/27/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
15
07/27/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
16
07/27/2018
Order of Detention
17
07/31/2018
Notice (Other)
18
08/06/2018
Hearing
08/06/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
08/10/2018
Order of Release
23
08/10/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
24
08/10/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
25
08/10/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
26
08/20/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
08/21/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
08/24/2018
Additional Related Document
31
08/28/2018
Continue
32
08/28/2018
Continue
33
08/28/2018
Appear
08/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
09/14/2018
Appear
09/14/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
01/23/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
01/24/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
05/02/2019
Unopposed Motion
67
05/02/2019
Affidavit
05/03/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/08/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
05/08/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
05/08/2019
Initial Appearance (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/08/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
05/08/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
77
05/08/2019
Order of Release
79
05/11/2019
Notice (Other)
82
05/15/2019
Plea Agreement
83
05/15/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
05/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.