USA v. Williams
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00113-60788 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/20/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
09/20/2018
Indictment - For Public
09/21/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
09/24/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
5
09/24/2018
Pretrial Services Report
09/24/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
09/24/2018
Order of Detention
8
09/24/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
9
09/27/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
10
10/22/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
11
10/29/2018
Notice (Other)
13
11/01/2018
Unopposed Motion
14
11/01/2018
Affidavit
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
11/08/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
11/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
11/13/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
11/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
12/31/2018
Notice (Other)
01/04/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
01/23/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
01/31/2019
Suppress
32
01/31/2019
Declaration
02/01/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
01/31/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
34
01/31/2019
Hearing
36
02/01/2019
Hearing
02/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
02/07/2019
Response in Opposition
42
02/09/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
02/12/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
02/14/2019
Appear
45
02/18/2019
Notice (Other)
02/19/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
02/22/2019
Order
50
03/01/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
03/04/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/16/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
04/19/2019
Continue
04/22/2019
Clerks Notice of Non-Compliance With Order of Progression (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
04/26/2019
Unopposed Motion
56
04/26/2019
Expedite
57
04/29/2019
Order
04/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
05/03/2019
Continue
60
05/03/2019
Status Report
05/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
05/14/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
05/16/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.