USA v. Williams
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00124-60906 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/18/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
10/18/2018
Indictment - For Public
10/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
10/31/2018
Pretrial Services Report
10/31/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
10/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
8
11/06/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
9
11/06/2018
Passport Surrendered
10
11/08/2018
Notice (Other)
11
12/06/2018
Continue
12
12/06/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
12/10/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/11/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
01/23/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
21
04/09/2019
Plea Agreement
22
04/09/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
23
04/09/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
24
04/09/2019
Unopposed Motion
25
04/09/2019
Unopposed Motion
26
04/09/2019
Declaration
04/11/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
05/21/2019
Continue
05/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.