USA v. Wolf
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00159-61112 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/13/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
12/13/2018
Indictment - For Public
3
12/13/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
4
12/13/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
12/13/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
12/19/2018
Pretrial Services Report
12/20/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/20/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
12/20/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
12
12/20/2018
Order of Detention
13
12/20/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
14
12/21/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
01/25/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
04/04/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
04/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
04/09/2019
Plea Agreement
19
04/09/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
04/11/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.