USA v. Wolfe et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00080 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
257
05/22/2018
Summons Returned Executed
05/29/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
259
05/29/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
260
05/29/2018
Notice (Other)
261
05/29/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
06/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
263
06/29/2018
Notice (Other)
07/02/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
273
11/09/2018
Violation Disposition Report
274
11/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/13/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
277
12/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/14/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.