USA v. Wood et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00057-53603 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
77
01/17/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
01/17/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Initial Appearance (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
01/22/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
81
01/22/2019
Order
82
01/22/2019
Order of Detention
01/23/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
02/05/2019
Release from Custody
02/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
87
02/06/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
88
02/06/2019
Order of Release
89
02/22/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
03/20/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
04/25/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.