USA v. Woodman
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00032-59501 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
2
05/24/2018
Z-Recommendation for Participation in AK Hope Court
3
05/24/2018
Z-Order of Referral to the Alaska Hope Court
05/25/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
05/30/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
06/11/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/29/2018
Order on Petition for Warrant for Offender - 12C
21
10/29/2018
Z-Order for Start of Jail Sanction/Release From Jail
10/29/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
10/30/2018
Z-Order Terminating Participant from the Alaska Hope Court Program
23
10/31/2018
Order
11/01/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
11/15/2018
Warrant Returned Executed

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.