USA v. Worden
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00120 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
32
07/02/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/03/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
08/31/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
37
09/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
38
09/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
09/21/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
10/02/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
42
10/10/2018
Judgment
43
10/10/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
44
10/11/2018
Transcript
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.