USA v. Xayamonty et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00045 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
177
07/06/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
179
08/20/2018
Continue
08/22/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
181
08/28/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
184
11/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
185
11/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
186
11/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
187
11/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
11/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/17/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
194
12/01/2018
Judgment
195
12/01/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.