USA v. Yang
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00144-61008 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
7
11/15/2018
Unopposed Motion
8
11/15/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
9
11/15/2018
Indictment - For Public
11/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/17/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/17/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
11/17/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
13
11/19/2018
Order of Detention
14
11/19/2018
Third Party Custodian Report
15
11/19/2018
Bail Review Hearing
16
11/19/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
17
11/19/2018
Order of Release
18
11/27/2018
Protective Order
19
11/28/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
20
12/07/2018
Passport Surrendered
21
12/12/2018
Unopposed Motion
22
12/12/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
27
12/19/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
01/04/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
01/08/2019
Modify Conditions of Release
01/08/2019
Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
02/01/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
34
04/01/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
04/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
04/05/2019
Plea Agreement
38
04/05/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
04/11/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
04/11/2019
Notice (Other)
41
04/15/2019
Supplement
04/15/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
04/23/2019
Supplement
44
04/23/2019
Supplement
45
04/24/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
46
04/24/2019
Additional Related Document
47
04/24/2019
Declaration
48
04/24/2019
Expedite
49
04/24/2019
Declaration
04/25/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
Order on Motion to Expedite (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.