USA v. Yu
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00062 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
54
06/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
55
07/12/2018
DEPS Notice
07/16/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
07/12/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
59
08/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
60
08/07/2018
Exhibit List
61
08/07/2018
Witness List Public Doc
62
08/17/2018
Notice (Other)
63
09/11/2018
Notice (Other)
09/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
65
09/18/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
66
09/18/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
67
09/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
68
09/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
09/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
10/02/2018
Judgment
73
10/02/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
74
10/16/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
75
10/16/2018
Declaration
76
10/16/2018
USCA Case Number
77
10/16/2018
USCA Time Schedule Order
10/17/2018
USCA Appeal Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
10/19/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
80
10/22/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
81
10/25/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
10/25/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
10/25/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
84
11/02/2018
Response in Opposition
85
11/06/2018
Designation of Record on Appeal
86
11/06/2018
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
11/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
11/09/2018
Leave to File Document
11/15/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.