USA v. Zavala-Flores et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cr-00007 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
65
05/25/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
66
05/25/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
67
05/25/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
05/29/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
05/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
05/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
06/11/2018
Judgment
73
06/11/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
74
07/02/2018
Modify Conditions of Release
07/03/2018
Docket Annotation re no Proposed Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
07/03/2018
Notice (Other)
76
07/10/2018
Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
07/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
08/16/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.