USA v. Ziegler
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00058 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
70
06/22/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
06/25/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
06/26/2018
Hearing
73
07/02/2018
Response in Opposition
74
07/02/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
07/06/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
08/02/2018
DEPS Notice
08/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
08/03/2018
Motion Hearing
80
08/03/2018
Witness List
81
08/03/2018
Exhibit List
82
08/03/2018
Exhibit List
08/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
08/17/2018
Transcript
85
09/11/2018
Report and Recommendation - Initial (Final R&R to follow)
86
10/01/2018
Report and Recommendation - Final
10/02/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
10/23/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
10/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
92
11/01/2018
Plea Agreement
93
11/01/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
11/05/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.