Ulysses James Smith
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2016-bk-04766 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 272 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/17/2016
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Ulysses James Smith
2
11/17/2016
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith.
4
11/17/2016
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith.
5
11/17/2016
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith.
11/17/2016
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(16-04766-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20048718. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/17/2016
Tax Documents for the Year for 2015 Filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith.
7
11/17/2016
Motion to Determine Value of 2012 Infinity M37 financed by Bank of America Filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith
8
11/17/2016
Motion to Determine Value of 2014 Kia Forte financed by Fifth Third Bank Filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith
9
11/17/2016
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/14/2016 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/24/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/14/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/16/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/13/2017.
10
11/18/2016
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
11/18/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 7 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith, 8 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith). Hearing scheduled 1/24/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
12
11/19/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 11/19/2016.
13
11/20/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith). Notice Date 11/20/2016.
14
11/20/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/20/2016.
15
11/20/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/20/2016.
16
11/22/2016
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor CADENCE BANK, N.A.
17
12/08/2016
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by S. Keith Eady Filed by Creditor Federal National Mortgage Association ("Fannie Mae"), as Creditor in c/o Seterus, Inc. (Eady, S.)
18
12/13/2016
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith.
19
12/14/2016
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed) with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Federal National Mortgage Association ("Fannie Mae"), as Creditor in c/o Seterus, Inc.
1
Exhibit Escrow Anaysis) (Eady, S.
1 Attachment
20
12/15/2016
Meeting of Creditors Held 12/14/2016. (Ch13troffice, jc)
21
12/15/2016
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed) with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Federal National Mortgage Association ("Fannie Mae"), as Creditor in c/o Seterus, Inc.
1
Exhibit Escrow Anaysis) (Eady, S.
1 Attachment
22
12/19/2016
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
23
12/19/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 22 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/24/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
24
12/21/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/21/2016.
25
12/28/2016
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor FIFTH THIRD BANK (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith.).
1
Exhibit "A"
1 Attachment
26
12/28/2016
Response to (Re Item: 8 Motion to Determine Value of 2014 Kia Forte financed by Fifth Third Bank filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith) Filed by Creditor FIFTH THIRD BANK
27
12/28/2016
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 25 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor FIFTH THIRD BANK, 26 Response filed by Creditor FIFTH THIRD BANK). Hearing scheduled 1/24/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
28
01/26/2017
Debtor's Objection to Claim 4 of creditor 1st Franklin Financial Corp. in the amount of $1,957.70 Filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith. (Shinn, J.)
29
01/27/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 28 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith). Hearing scheduled 2/28/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
30
01/29/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 29 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/29/2017.
31
01/30/2017
Order - Settled Signed on 1/30/2017 (RE: related document(s) 25 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor FIFTH THIRD BANK, 26 Response filed by Creditor FIFTH THIRD BANK).
32
02/01/2017
Order Granting Debtor's Motion to Determine Value of Collateral - 2012 Infinity M37 - Bank of America, N.A. (Related Doc # 7) Signed on 2/1/2017.
33
02/01/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 31 Order (Generic)). Notice Date 02/01/2017.
34
02/02/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing.
35
02/03/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 32 Order on Motion to Determine Value). Notice Date 02/03/2017.
36
02/07/2017
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (No Proof of Claim Filed) with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Federal National Mortgage Association ("Fannie Mae"), as Creditor in c/o Seterus, Inc. (Eady, S.)
37
02/14/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 2/14/2017 (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith, 22 Trustees Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn.
38
02/14/2017
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 28 Debtor's Objection to Claim 4 of creditor 1st Franklin Financial Corp. in the amount of $1,957.70 Filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith. (Shinn, J.)). (Shinn, J.)
39
02/15/2017
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 4 Signed on 2/15/2017 (RE: related document(s) 28 Withdrawing Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Ulysses James Smith).
40
02/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 02/16/2017.
41
02/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 39 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 02/17/2017.
42
07/14/2017
Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan After Confirmation. (Ch13troffice, ct)
43
07/14/2017
Notice and Order Granting Trustee's Motion To Modify Confirmed Plan Increasing Plan Payments in the amount of $1,101.00 semi-monthly. Signed on 7/14/2017 (RE: related document(s) 42 Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan).
44
07/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 43 Notice and Order on Trustee's Motion To Modify Confirmed Plan Increasing Plan Payments). Notice Date 07/16/2017.
45
10/12/2017
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, ct)
46
10/12/2017
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s) 45 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 11/14/2017 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
47
10/14/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 46 Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 10/14/2017.
48
10/26/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor MICHIGAN MUTUAL, INC.
1
Affidavit Affidavit #
2
Exhibit Note #
3
Exhibit Mortgage #
4
Exhibit AOM
4 Attachments
10/26/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(16-04766-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21328328. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 48) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
10/26/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor MICHIGAN MUTUAL, INC. (RE: related document(s) 48 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
50
10/27/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Michigan Mutual, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 48 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor MICHIGAN MUTUAL, INC.). Hearing scheduled 11/14/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
52
10/29/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 50 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 10/29/2017.
53
11/14/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 11/14/2017 (RE: related document(s) 48 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor MICHIGAN MUTUAL, INC.). Hearing scheduled 12/12/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
54
11/15/2017
Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s) 45 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
55
11/15/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Cadence Bank, N.A.
1
Equity Line Agreement #
2
Mortgage
2 Attachments
56
11/15/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Cadence Bank, N.A. (RE: related document(s) 55 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
11/15/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(16-04766-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21403853. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 55) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
11/16/2017
Order Conditionally Denying Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Related Doc # 45) Signed on 11/16/2017. Plan Payments are modified to $1,152.00 semi-monthly.
58
11/16/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Cadence Bank, N.A. (RE: related document(s) 55 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Cadence Bank, N.A.). Hearing scheduled 12/12/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
60
11/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 53 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 11/16/2017.
61
11/18/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 58 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 11/18/2017.
62
11/18/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 57 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Notice Date 11/18/2017.
63
12/11/2017
Courtroom Deputy Notes (By agreement of the parties, this matter is settled and Mrs. Rouse shall submit a proposed order.) RE: Doc #48; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Beth McFadden Rouse, Attorney for Michigan Mutual, Inc.
64
12/12/2017
Courtroom Deputy Notes (By agreement of the parties, this matter is settled and Mrs. Crowe shall submit a proposed order.) RE: Doc #55; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Enslen Crowe, Attorney for Cadence Bank, N.A.
65
12/19/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Enslen Crowe Filed by Creditor Seterus, Inc.
66
01/03/2018
Consent Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 48) Signed on 1/3/2018.
67
01/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 66 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 01/05/2018.
68
01/23/2018
Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 55) Signed on 1/23/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.