United Cook Inlet Drift Association et al v. National Marine Fisheries Service et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cv-00104 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
134
06/04/2018
Notice of Appearance
06/08/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
136
06/27/2018
Status Report
137
09/11/2018
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
138
09/21/2018
Order
139
10/24/2018
Status Report
140
11/20/2018
Notice of Appeal
141
11/27/2018
USCA Case Number
142
11/27/2018
USCA Scheduling Order
143
12/03/2018
Notice of Cross Appeal
144
12/10/2018
USCA Case Number
145
12/10/2018
USCA Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.