United States of America for the use of J&L Paving LLC v. Rockford Corporation et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00156 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/29/2018
Complaint
2
07/02/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
07/02/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/02/2018
Unissued Summons
4
07/04/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
5
07/04/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
07/05/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
07/10/2018
Order
9
08/08/2018
Notice of Appearance
10
08/08/2018
Notice of Appearance
11
08/08/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
12
08/12/2018
Additional Related Document
13
08/20/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
14
08/23/2018
Counterclaim
15
08/24/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
16
08/31/2018
Notice of Appearance
17
08/31/2018
Notice of Appearance
18
08/31/2018
Counterclaim
22
09/14/2018
Strike
23
09/28/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
24
10/01/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
25
10/04/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
26
10/12/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
27
10/16/2018
Scheduling Order
28
10/16/2018
ORDER re 22 Motion to Strike. The motion at docket 22 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Rockford shall file an Amended Answer which does not include a counterclaim within 7 days. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
29
10/19/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
30
10/19/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
31
10/23/2018
Amended Answer to Complaint
32
02/15/2019
Stay
33
02/23/2019
Order on Motion to Stay
03/03/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
03/05/2019
Statement
36
03/06/2019
Summary Judgment
37
03/27/2019
Summary Judgment
38
03/27/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
39
03/27/2019
Affidavit
40
04/09/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
41
04/09/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
42
04/22/2019
Notice (Other)
43
04/22/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
44
04/23/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
45
04/26/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
46
04/26/2019
Hearing
47
04/26/2019
Notice of Appearance
48
04/30/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
49
05/03/2019
ORDER denying 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 46 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/3/19. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.