United States of America v. Beaty
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00238 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/05/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
2
03/05/2019
Order
3
03/05/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
4
03/05/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
03/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
03/05/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
03/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/05/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
03/30/2019
Notice (Other)
9
03/30/2019
Notice (Other)
05/06/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
05/06/2019
Report and Recommendation - Initial (Final R&R to follow)
12
05/08/2019
Objection to Report and Recommendations
13
05/14/2019
Expedite
14
05/14/2019
Affidavit
15
05/14/2019
Continue
16
05/14/2019
Affidavit
05/15/2019
Order on Motion to Expedite (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.