United States of America v. Gupta
Court Docket Sheet

2nd Circuit Court of Appeals

2012-04448 (ca2)

MOTION ORDER, granting motion to stay [{{16}}] filed by Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, by JAC, RR, FILED. [787606][47] [12-4448] [Entered: 12/06/2012 08:52 AM]

UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE SECOND CIRCUIT ______________________________________________ At a Stated Term of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, held at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, in the City of New York, on the 6th day of December, two thousand and twelve. Present: José A. Cabranes, Reena Raggi, Circuit Judges.* _____________________________________________ United States of America, Appellee, ORDER Docket No. 12-4448-cr v. Rajat K. Gupta, Defendant-Appellant. _____________________________________________ On a review of the record, it is hereby ORDERED that the conditions of release established by the District Court shall remain in full force and effect during the pendency of this appeal and the appeal will be EXPEDITED. In the interests of judicial economy, pending an assignment of this matter to a merits panel, any other application to this Court on questions regarding bond or conditions of release shall be referred to this panel. Appellant’s brief shall be filed by no later than January 18, 2013; Appellee’s brief by no later than March 15, 2013; and Appellant’s reply brief by no later than March 29, 2013. Solely for the purpose of entering such further orders or conditions of release as may be appropriate or necessary, a limited mandate shall issue forthwith. * The Honorable Susan L. Carney, originally a member of the panel sitting on December 4, 2012, recused herself from consideration of this matter. The remaining members of this panel, who are in agreement, have decided this case pursuant to 2d Cir. R § 0.14(b). The Clerk shall assign the merits appeal to a panel sitting on or after the week of April 1, 2013. For the Court: Catherine O’Hagan Wolfe, Clerk of Court

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 309 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/13/2012
NOTICE OF CRIMINAL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. [765984] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/13/2012 12:36 PM]
2
11/13/2012
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, district court receipt # 465401052546, FILED.[766005] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/13/2012 12:40 PM]
3
11/13/2012
DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/09/2012, RECEIVED.[766009] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/13/2012 12:40 PM]
4
11/13/2012
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[766011] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/13/2012 12:40 PM]
5
11/13/2012
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 11/13/2012 by CM/ECF. [766389] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/13/2012 02:57 PM]
6
11/13/2012
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 11/13/2012 by CM/ECF. [766395] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/13/2012 03:00 PM]
7
11/13/2012
ATTORNEY, Seth P. Waxman for Rajat K. Gupta, in case 12-4448, [5], ADDED.[766400] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/13/2012 03:01 PM]
8
11/13/2012
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 11/13/2012 by CM/ECF. [766405] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/13/2012 03:02 PM]
10
11/13/2012
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 11/13/2012 by CM/ECF. [766410] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/13/2012 03:04 PM]
11
11/13/2012
ATTORNEY, Paul Reinherz Wolfson for Rajat K. Gupta, in case 12-4448, [6], ADDED.[766414] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/13/2012 03:05 PM]
12
11/13/2012
ATTORNEY, Daniel Joseph Aguilar for Rajat K. Gupta, in case 12-4448, [8], ADDED.[766419] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/13/2012 03:06 PM]
13
11/13/2012
ATTORNEY, Megan Barbero for Rajat K. Gupta, in case 12-4448, [10], ADDED.[766421] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/13/2012 03:07 PM]
14
11/13/2012
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 11/13/2012 by CM/ECF. [766428] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/13/2012 03:08 PM]
15
11/13/2012
ATTORNEY, Alan E Schoenfeld for Rajat K. Gupta, in case 12-4448, [14], ADDED.[766444] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/13/2012 03:15 PM]
16
11/13/2012
MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 11/13/2012 by email, CM/ECF, hand delivery. [766559] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/13/2012 03:45 PM]
21
11/16/2012
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 11/16/2012 by CM/ECF. [771323] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/16/2012 02:50 PM]
22
11/19/2012
ATTORNEY, David Stanley Frankel for Rajat K. Gupta, in case 12-4448, [21], ADDED.[771899] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/19/2012 07:42 AM]
24
11/20/2012
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 11/20/2012 by CM/ECF.[773689] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/20/2012 10:20 AM]
25
11/20/2012
FORM B, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 11/20/2012 by CM/ECF.[773690] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/20/2012 10:22 AM]
28
11/26/2012
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 11/24/2012 by CM/ECF. [777537] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/26/2012 04:33 PM]
29
11/26/2012
OPPOSITION TO MOTION to stay [16], on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 11/26/2012 by CM/ECF. [777716][29] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/26/2012 07:29 PM]
30
11/27/2012
ATTORNEY, Reed Michael Brodsky for United States of America, in case 12-4448, [28], ADDED.[777752] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/27/2012 07:46 AM]
34
11/27/2012
ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[778087] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/27/2012 10:20 AM]
36
11/27/2012
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 11/27/2012 by CM/ECF. [779131] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/27/2012 04:47 PM]
37
11/28/2012
ATTORNEY, Alan Roy Friedman for Rajat K. Gupta, in case 12-4448, [36], ADDED.[779314] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/28/2012 07:44 AM]
38
11/29/2012
**REVISED**ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[782026] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/29/2012 03:13 PM]
39
11/30/2012
REPLY TO OPPOSITION [29], on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 11/30/2012 by CM/ECF.[783034][39] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/30/2012 12:01 PM]
113
12/05/2012
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[883667] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/21/2013 11:49 AM]
47
12/06/2012
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to stay [16] filed by Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, by JAC, RR, FILED. [787606][47] [12-4448] [Entered: 12/06/2012 08:52 AM]
48
12/06/2012
EXPEDITED SCHEDULING ORDER re: Brief due date as 01/18/2013;. Brief due date as 03/15/2013. Appellant reply brief due date as 03/29/2013;, FILED.[787609] [12-4448] [Entered: 12/06/2012 08:54 AM]
50
12/06/2012
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 12/06/2012, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[787631] [12-4448] [Entered: 12/06/2012 09:07 AM]
52
12/06/2012
NEW CASE MANAGER, Gerard Whidbee, ASSIGNED.[788210] [12-4448] [Entered: 12/06/2012 01:14 PM]
114
12/20/2012
ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[883668] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/21/2013 11:49 AM]
54
01/15/2013
MOTION, for___relief, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 01/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [816247] [12-4448] [Entered: 01/15/2013 10:00 AM]
59
01/17/2013
MOTION ORDER, granting motion for permission to file non-conforming exhibits, [54] filed by Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, by CFD, FILED. [819291][59] [12-4448] [Entered: 01/17/2013 11:49 AM]
61
01/18/2013
SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 01/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[821195] [12-4448] [Entered: 01/18/2013 03:17 PM]
62
01/18/2013
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 6, (pp. 1-251), on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 01/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[821368] [12-4448] [Entered: 01/18/2013 04:13 PM]
63
01/18/2013
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 6, (pp. 252-522), on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 01/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[821372] [12-4448] [Entered: 01/18/2013 04:16 PM]
64
01/18/2013
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 6, (pp. 523-793), on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 01/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[821377] [12-4448] [Entered: 01/18/2013 04:18 PM]
65
01/18/2013
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 6, (pp. 794-1064), on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 01/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[821385] [12-4448] [Entered: 01/18/2013 04:21 PM]
66
01/18/2013
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 6, (pp. 1065-1354), on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 01/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[821393] [12-4448] [Entered: 01/18/2013 04:25 PM]
67
01/18/2013
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 6, (pp. 1355-1647), on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 01/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[821493] [12-4448] [Entered: 01/18/2013 06:00 PM]
68
01/18/2013
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 01/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[821496] [12-4448] [Entered: 01/18/2013 06:05 PM]
73
01/18/2013
EXHIBITS, on CD-ROM volume(s) 1 of 1, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 01/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[823771] [12-4448] [Entered: 01/23/2013 12:03 PM]
69
01/23/2013
NOTICE, for the submission of additional paper copies of the appendix or joint appendix, SENT.[823602] [12-4448] [Entered: 01/23/2013 11:16 AM]
79
02/11/2013
CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 04/01/2013, PROPOSED.[843043] [12-4448] [Entered: 02/11/2013 11:26 AM]
80
02/12/2013
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 02/12/2013 by CM/ECF. [844074] [12-4448] [Entered: 02/12/2013 05:19 PM]
111
02/12/2013
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[883454] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/21/2013 10:37 AM]
81
02/13/2013
ATTORNEY, Justin S. Weddle for United States of America, in case 12-4448, [80], ADDED.[844253] [12-4448] [Entered: 02/13/2013 09:36 AM]
82
02/15/2013
MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 02/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [848020] [12-4448] [Entered: 02/15/2013 02:49 PM]
83
02/15/2013
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 02/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [848306] [12-4448] [Entered: 02/15/2013 04:44 PM]
85
02/19/2013
ATTORNEY, Richard Tarlowe for United States of America, in case 12-4448, [83], ADDED.[848684] [12-4448] [Entered: 02/19/2013 09:50 AM]
90
02/28/2013
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [82] filed by Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, by RKW, FILED. [860063][90] [12-4448] [Entered: 02/28/2013 11:48 AM]
91
03/07/2013
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Seth P. Waxman for Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 03/07/2013 by CM/ECF. [867792] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/07/2013 01:56 PM]
92
03/08/2013
MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 03/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [869484] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/08/2013 02:30 PM]
94
03/11/2013
OPPOSITION TO MOTION to file oversized brief [92], on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 03/11/2013 by CM/ECF. [870078][94] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/11/2013 09:24 AM]
96
03/11/2013
CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 04/29/2013, PROPOSED.[870304] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/11/2013 10:27 AM]
112
03/11/2013
ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[883455] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/21/2013 10:37 AM]
103
03/13/2013
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file oversized brief [92] filed by Appellee United States of America, by RCW, FILED. [874660][103] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/13/2013 04:13 PM]
104
03/19/2013
LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, RECEIVED. Service date 03/19/2013 by CM/ECF.[880757] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/19/2013 01:53 PM]
107
03/20/2013
CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 04/29/2013, SET.[882091] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/20/2013 12:30 PM]
109
03/20/2013
ORDER, oral argument adjourned, FILED.[882131] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/20/2013 12:44 PM]
110
03/20/2013
CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 05/20/2013, PROPOSED.[882830] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/20/2013 04:27 PM]
115
03/21/2013
MOTION, for___relief, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 03/21/2013 by CM/ECF. [884628] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/21/2013 11:10 PM]
117
03/22/2013
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 03/22/2013 by CM/ECF. [886063] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/22/2013 07:34 PM]
123
03/27/2013
MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 03/27/2013 by CM/ECF. [889945] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/27/2013 02:10 PM]
128
04/04/2013
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to preserve the expedited schedule for briefing, [115] filed by Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. [896743][128] [12-4448] [Entered: 04/04/2013 10:11 AM]
129
04/04/2013
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file oversized brief [123] filed by Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. [896865][129] [12-4448] [Entered: 04/04/2013 10:52 AM]
131
04/09/2013
CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 05/21/2013, SET.[901251] [12-4448] [Entered: 04/09/2013 12:22 PM]
132
04/10/2013
ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[902909] [12-4448] [Entered: 04/10/2013 11:59 AM]
134
04/12/2013
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 04/12/2013 by CM/ECF. [906567] [12-4448] [Entered: 04/12/2013 06:20 PM]
135
04/12/2013
REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 04/12/2013 by CM/ECF. [906570] [12-4448] [Entered: 04/12/2013 06:31 PM]
141
04/23/2013
1ST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[916861] [12-4448] [Entered: 04/24/2013 08:44 AM]
142
05/21/2013
CASE, before JON, ALK, RSP, C.JJ., HEARD.[943678] [12-4448] [Entered: 05/21/2013 10:24 AM]
143
05/21/2013
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[944193] [12-4448] [Entered: 05/21/2013 02:10 PM]
144
05/22/2013
ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[945425] [12-4448] [Entered: 05/22/2013 02:41 PM]
145
05/24/2013
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[947994] [12-4448] [Entered: 05/24/2013 04:04 PM]
146
05/29/2013
ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[950387] [12-4448] [Entered: 05/29/2013 03:01 PM]
148
08/28/2013
ORDER, dated 08/28/2013, directing that the appeal filed under 13-916 be held in abeyance pending the determination of the appeal in 12-4448, by JON, ALK, RSP, FILED.[1028489] [12-4448] [Entered: 08/28/2013 03:01 PM]
150
03/25/2014
NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[1185914] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/25/2014 09:51 AM]
151
03/25/2014
OPINION, judgment of the district court is affirmed, by JON, ALK, RSP, FILED.[1185926] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/25/2014 09:57 AM]
155
03/25/2014
JUDGMENT, FILED.[1186420] [12-4448] [Entered: 03/25/2014 02:32 PM]
156
04/08/2014
PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 04/08/2014 by CM/ECF.[1197500] [12-4448] [Entered: 04/08/2014 05:13 PM]
158
05/13/2014
MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, FILED. Service date 05/13/2014 by hand delivery, CM/ECF. [1223644] [12-4448] [Entered: 05/13/2014 04:16 PM]
162
05/27/2014
OPPOSITION TO MOTION to stay [158], on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 05/27/2014 by CM/ECF. [1234104][162] [12-4448] [Entered: 05/27/2014 08:44 PM]
166
05/30/2014
MOTION ORDER, denying motion to stay Appellant's surrender and continuation of bail pending further appellate review [158] filed by Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, by JON, ALK, RSP, FILED. [1236979][166] [12-4448] [Entered: 05/30/2014 11:17 AM]
167
05/30/2014
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 05/30/2014, to SDNY, ISSUED.[1236985] [12-4448] [Entered: 05/30/2014 11:18 AM]
168
06/04/2014
LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, RECEIVED. Service date 06/04/2014 by CM/ECF.[1240796] [12-4448] [Entered: 06/04/2014 04:42 PM]
169
06/05/2014
ATTORNEY, Megan Barbero, for Appellant Rajat K. Gupta, TERMINATED.[1240927] [12-4448] [Entered: 06/05/2014 08:50 AM]
170
06/10/2014
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, RECEIVED. Service date 06/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1244317] [12-4448] [Entered: 06/10/2014 11:43 AM]
171
06/10/2014
ATTORNEY, Reed Michael Brodsky, for Appellee United States of America, TERMINATED.[1244336] [12-4448] [Entered: 06/10/2014 11:52 AM]
173
06/18/2014
ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 03/25/2014, by ALK, FILED.[1250976] [12-4448] [Entered: 06/18/2014 09:47 AM]
174
07/14/2014
ORDER, petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc denied, FILED.[1270562] [12-4448] [Entered: 07/14/2014 03:39 PM]
175
07/21/2014
JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1275141] [12-4448] [Entered: 07/21/2014 09:08 AM]
176
09/09/2014
U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, granting Appellant Rajat K. Gupta extension to file Writ of Certiorari, FILED.[1319988] [12-4448] [Entered: 09/15/2014 02:39 PM]
177
11/12/2014
U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 11/12/2014, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 14-534, RECEIVED.[1370197] [12-4448] [Entered: 11/14/2014 02:49 PM]
178
04/20/2015
U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 04/20/2015, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 14-534, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is denied, RECEIVED.[1489814] [12-4448] [Entered: 04/21/2015 09:40 AM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.