United States of America v. Klawock Oceanside, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00136 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/13/2018
Complaint
2
06/13/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
06/13/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
06/13/2018
Unissued Summons
4
07/17/2018
Notice (Other)
5
07/17/2018
Notice of Appearance
6
07/17/2018
Answer to Complaint
7
07/17/2018
Additional Related Document
8
07/18/2018
Certificate of Service
9
07/19/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
10
08/09/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
11
09/11/2018
Scheduling Order
03/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/05/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
03/15/2019
Continue
14
03/18/2019
Order on Motion to Continue
05/03/2019
Scheduling Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
05/03/2019
Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.