United States of America v. Litvak
Court Docket Sheet

2014-02902 (ca2)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 185 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/14/2014
NOTICE OF CRIMINAL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. [1296270] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/15/2014 11:29 AM]
2
08/14/2014
DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 07/25/2014, RECEIVED.[1296282] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/15/2014 11:33 AM]
3
08/14/2014
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, district court receipt # CTXN00008656, FILED.[1296287] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/15/2014 11:34 AM]
4
08/15/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 08/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1296736] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/15/2014 04:13 PM]
5
08/15/2014
ATTORNEY, Kannon K. Shanmugam, [4], in place of attorney Ross H. Garber, SUBSTITUTED.[1296747] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/15/2014 04:18 PM]
6
08/15/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 08/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1296759] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/15/2014 04:30 PM]
7
08/15/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 08/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1296855] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/15/2014 05:50 PM]
8
08/18/2014
ATTORNEY, Masha Hansford for Jesse C. Litvak, in case 14-2902, [6], ADDED.[1296964] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/18/2014 08:38 AM]
9
08/18/2014
ATTORNEY, Allison Blair Jones for Jesse C. Litvak, in case 14-2902, [7], ADDED.[1296968] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/18/2014 08:40 AM]
10
08/18/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 08/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1297020] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/18/2014 09:12 AM]
11
08/18/2014
ATTORNEY, Dane Hal Butswinkas for Jesse C. Litvak, in case 14-2902, [10], ADDED.[1297061] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/18/2014 09:32 AM]
12
08/19/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 08/19/2014 by CM/ECF.[1298156] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/19/2014 09:18 AM]
13
08/19/2014
FORM B, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 08/19/2014 by CM/ECF.[1298180] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/19/2014 09:26 AM]
16
08/19/2014
NEW CASE MANAGER, Frank Perez, ASSIGNED.[1298807] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/19/2014 02:03 PM]
17
08/20/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 08/20/2014 by CM/ECF. [1299521] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/20/2014 10:13 AM]
18
08/20/2014
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Francis for United States of America, in case 14-2902, [17], ADDED.[1299711] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/20/2014 11:23 AM]
19
08/22/2014
MOTION, for bail, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 08/22/2014 by CM/ECF. [1301848] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/22/2014 10:08 AM]
23
08/26/2014
MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 08/26/2014 by CM/ECF. [1305536] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/26/2014 06:10 PM]
28
08/29/2014
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to respond to appellant's bail motion until 9/11/2014 [23] filed by Appellee USA United States of America, by SLC, FILED. [1308030][28] [14-2902] [Entered: 08/29/2014 09:46 AM]
29
09/02/2014
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, informing Court of proposed due date 11/18/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 09/02/2014 by CM/ECF.[1309557] [14-2902] [Entered: 09/02/2014 12:39 PM]
30
09/02/2014
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Jesse C. Litvak Brief due date as 11/18/2014; Joint Appendix due date as 11/18/2014, FILED.[1309965] [14-2902] [Entered: 09/02/2014 04:15 PM]
33
09/11/2014
OPPOSITION TO MOTION for bail [19], on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 09/11/2014 by CM/ECF. [1317948][33] [14-2902] [Entered: 09/11/2014 04:07 PM]
35
08/21/2014
INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1319915] [14-2902] [Entered: 09/15/2014 01:40 PM]
36
09/19/2014
ARGUMENT/SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1324069] [14-2902] [Entered: 09/19/2014 09:46 AM]
37
09/22/2014
REPLY TO OPPOSITION [33], on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 09/22/2014 by CM/ECF.[1325730][37] [14-2902] [Entered: 09/22/2014 01:53 PM]
41
10/03/2014
MOTION ORDER, granting motion for bail pending appeal, [19], filed by Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, by RKW, RR, PWH, C.JJ., FILED. [1335682][41] [14-2902] [Entered: 10/03/2014 10:13 AM]
42
10/03/2014
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 10/03/2014, to United States District Court for the District of Connecticut, New Haven, ISSUED.[1335695] [14-2902] [Entered: 10/03/2014 10:18 AM]
43
10/07/2014
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM SIDLEY AUSTIN, with fee, RECEIVED.[1338284] [14-2902] [Entered: 10/07/2014 11:05 AM]
44
10/10/2014
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from M. CLEARY, with fee, RECEIVED.[1342368] [14-2902] [Entered: 10/10/2014 02:03 PM]
45
10/16/2014
ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED to Maureen Cleary. [1346186] [14-2902] [Entered: 10/16/2014 01:37 PM]
46
10/21/2014
ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED to Peter McGowan.[1349898] [14-2902] [Entered: 10/21/2014 12:26 PM]
47
10/21/2014
ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED to Susan Scott.[1349924] [14-2902] [Entered: 10/21/2014 12:43 PM]
48
10/21/2014
ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED to Kelly Owen-Diaz.[1349928] [14-2902] [Entered: 10/21/2014 12:45 PM]
49
11/03/2014
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD R. HERSHFANG, with fee, RECEIVED.[1361251] [14-2902] [Entered: 11/03/2014 06:02 PM]
50
11/14/2014
ARGUMENT CD, sent to Daniel Conniff, TRANSMITTED.[1370338] [14-2902] [Entered: 11/14/2014 03:27 PM]
51
11/18/2014
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 11/18/2014 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1372626] [14-2902] [Entered: 11/18/2014 02:25 PM]
52
11/18/2014
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 1-585), on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 11/18/2014 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1372638] [14-2902] [Entered: 11/18/2014 02:32 PM]
53
11/18/2014
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 586-1084), on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 11/18/2014 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1372644] [14-2902] [Entered: 11/18/2014 02:34 PM]
54
11/18/2014
CORRECTED BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 11/18/2014 by 3rd party, CM/ECF. [1373008] [14-2902]--[Edited 11/18/2014 by KS] [Entered: 11/18/2014 04:45 PM]
61
12/01/2014
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, informing Court of proposed due date 02/17/2015, RECEIVED. Service date 12/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1381334] [14-2902] [Entered: 12/01/2014 04:14 PM]
62
12/02/2014
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee USA United States of America Brief due date as 02/17/2015, FILED.[1381703] [14-2902] [Entered: 12/02/2014 09:16 AM]
65
01/26/2015
NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[1423317] [14-2902] [Entered: 01/26/2015 10:02 AM]
66
02/17/2015
MOTION, to file supplemental appendix, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 02/17/2015 by CM/ECF. [1439727] [14-2902] [Entered: 02/17/2015 05:19 PM]
67
02/17/2015
SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 02/17/2015 by CM/ECF. [1439729] [14-2902] [Entered: 02/17/2015 05:23 PM]
68
02/17/2015
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 02/17/2015 by CM/ECF. [1439743] [14-2902] [Entered: 02/17/2015 05:54 PM]
69
02/17/2015
MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 02/17/2015 by CM/ECF. [1439755] [14-2902] [Entered: 02/17/2015 09:04 PM]
73
02/18/2015
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time until March 17, 2015 to file the reply brief. [69] filed by Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. [1440069][73] [14-2902] [Entered: 02/18/2015 10:11 AM]
76
02/20/2015
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file supplemental appendix [66] filed by Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. [1442252][76] [14-2902] [Entered: 02/20/2015 08:39 AM]
78
02/24/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Jonathan Francis for Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 02/24/2015 by CM/ECF. [1445604] [14-2902] [Entered: 02/24/2015 05:46 PM]
81
03/03/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Kannon K. Shanmugam, Esq. for Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 03/03/2015 by CM/ECF. [1451306] [14-2902] [Entered: 03/03/2015 03:28 PM]
83
03/04/2015
CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 05/11/2015, PROPOSED.[1452225] [14-2902] [Entered: 03/04/2015 12:50 PM]
84
03/17/2015
CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 05/13/2015, SET.[1462351] [14-2902] [Entered: 03/17/2015 11:09 AM]
86
03/17/2015
REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 03/17/2015 by CM/ECF. [1462494] [14-2902] [Entered: 03/17/2015 11:53 AM]
88
04/03/2015
ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1476620] [14-2902] [Entered: 04/03/2015 12:04 PM]
89
04/03/2015
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 04/03/2015 by CM/ECF. [1476816] [14-2902] [Entered: 04/03/2015 02:36 PM]
90
04/03/2015
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 04/03/2015 by CM/ECF. [1476842] [14-2902] [Entered: 04/03/2015 02:59 PM]
93
05/13/2015
CASE, before CJS, BDP, SLC, C.JJ., HEARD.[1509000] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/13/2015 12:44 PM]
94
05/13/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from WESTLAW, with fee, RECEIVED.[1509485] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/13/2015 05:24 PM]
96
05/14/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM O'MELVENY & MYERS, with fee, RECEIVED.[1510785] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/14/2015 05:57 PM]
97
05/14/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM SIDLEY, with fee, RECEIVED.[1510786] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/14/2015 05:59 PM]
98
05/14/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM KAYE SCHOLER, with fee, RECEIVED.[1510787] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/14/2015 06:03 PM]
99
05/15/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, from Williams & Connolly LLP with fee, RECEIVED.[1511029] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/15/2015 09:51 AM]
100
05/15/2015
ARGUMENT CD, sent regular mail to Kannon K. Shanmugam at Williams & Connolly LLP TRANSMITTED.[1511033] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/15/2015 09:52 AM]
101
05/19/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM RK&O, with fee, RECEIVED.[1513963] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/19/2015 07:23 PM]
102
05/19/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM ALSTON & BIRD, with fee, RECEIVED.[1513964] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/19/2015 07:26 PM]
103
05/19/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM P. BENNETT, with fee, RECEIVED.[1513968] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/19/2015 08:01 PM]
104
05/21/2015
ARGUMENT CD, sent to John DiGregorio, TRANSMITTED.[1515164] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/21/2015 09:48 AM]
105
05/21/2015
ARGUMENT CD, sent to William Ioas,TRANSMITTED.[1515166] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/21/2015 09:49 AM]
106
05/21/2015
ARGUMENT CD, sent to Dan Norber,TRANSMITTED.[1515179] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/21/2015 09:55 AM]
107
05/21/2015
ARGUMENT CD, sent to Marie Bonitatibus, TRANSMITTED.[1515183] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/21/2015 09:55 AM]
108
05/21/2015
ARGUMENT CD, sent to Nicholas La Forge, TRANSMITTED.[1515194] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/21/2015 10:00 AM]
109
05/22/2015
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2015 by CM/ECF.[1516561] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/22/2015 12:17 PM]
111
05/29/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM S. DESISTO, with fee, RECEIVED.[1521080] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/29/2015 06:19 PM]
113
06/03/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[1523612] [14-2902] [Entered: 06/03/2015 11:00 AM]
114
06/03/2015
ARGUMENT CD, sent to Stephanie DeSisto, TRANSMITTED.[1523879] [14-2902] [Entered: 06/03/2015 01:54 PM]
115
06/05/2015
ARGUMENT CD(USDOJ), TRANSMITTED.[1526077] [14-2902] [Entered: 06/05/2015 02:57 PM]
116
06/05/2015
ARGUMENT CD(Sidley), TRANSMITTED.[1526080] [14-2902] [Entered: 06/05/2015 02:57 PM]
117
06/05/2015
ARGUMENT CD(USSEC), TRANSMITTED.[1526082] [14-2902] [Entered: 06/05/2015 02:58 PM]
118
06/05/2015
ARGUMENT CD(Ellington), TRANSMITTED.[1526084] [14-2902] [Entered: 06/05/2015 02:59 PM]
119
06/05/2015
ARGUMENT CD(Alston), TRANSMITTED.[1526087] [14-2902] [Entered: 06/05/2015 03:00 PM]
120
06/05/2015
ARGUMENT CD(Kirkland), TRANSMITTED.[1526088] [14-2902] [Entered: 06/05/2015 03:00 PM]
121
06/05/2015
ARGUMENT CD(Park Jensen Bennett), TRANSMITTED.[1526090] [14-2902] [Entered: 06/05/2015 03:01 PM]
122
06/05/2015
ARGUMENT CD(RKO), TRANSMITTED.[1526097] [14-2902] [Entered: 06/05/2015 03:05 PM]
123
06/05/2015
ARGUMENT CD(Weinberg), TRANSMITTED.[1526101] [14-2902] [Entered: 06/05/2015 03:06 PM]
124
06/08/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM MORVILLO ET AL, with fee, RECEIVED.[1527434] [14-2902] [Entered: 06/08/2015 04:58 PM]
125
06/18/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM WILSON SONSINI GOODRICH & ROSATI, with fee, RECEIVED.[1535849] [14-2902] [Entered: 06/18/2015 04:35 PM]
126
06/22/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP with fee, RECEIVED.[1537507] [14-2902] [Entered: 06/22/2015 01:54 PM]
128
07/08/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from HUGHES HUBBARD, with fee, RECEIVED.[1548779] [14-2902] [Entered: 07/08/2015 11:50 AM]
129
07/09/2015
ARGUMENT CD sent to David Shanies, TRANSMITTED.[1549756] [14-2902] [Entered: 07/09/2015 11:05 AM]
130
07/16/2015
ARGUMENT CD sent to Morris Fodeman, TRANSMITTED.[1555231] [14-2902] [Entered: 07/16/2015 09:42 AM]
131
07/16/2015
ARGUMENT CD sent to Miriam Glaser, TRANSMITTED.[1555272] [14-2902] [Entered: 07/16/2015 09:58 AM]
132
07/23/2015
ARGUMENT CD, sent to Cassandra Vogel, TRANSMITTED.[1605892] [14-2902] [Entered: 09/24/2015 11:28 AM]
134
12/08/2015
NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[1658378] [14-2902] [Entered: 12/08/2015 09:25 AM]
135
12/08/2015
OPINION, reversing and vacating the judgment of the district court and remanding the case for a new trial, by CJS, BDP, SLC, FILED.[1658389] [14-2902] [Entered: 12/08/2015 09:29 AM]
136
12/08/2015
CERTIFIED OPINION, dated 12/08/2015, to CONNECTICUT (NEW HAVEN), ISSUED.[1658394] [14-2902] [Entered: 12/08/2015 09:32 AM]
139
12/08/2015
INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1658686] [14-2902] [Entered: 12/08/2015 11:46 AM]
141
12/08/2015
JUDGMENT, FILED.[1659114] [14-2902] [Entered: 12/08/2015 03:30 PM]
142
12/18/2015
MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 12/18/2015 by CM/ECF. [1667732] [14-2902] [Entered: 12/18/2015 01:16 PM]
146
12/22/2015
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time until 01/21/2016 to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc [142] filed by Appellee USA United States of America, by SLC, FILED. [1670401][146] [14-2902] [Entered: 12/22/2015 04:07 PM]
147
02/03/2016
JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1697791] [14-2902] [Entered: 02/03/2016 01:16 PM]
148
05/03/2017
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from DAY PIITNEY, with fee, RECEIVED.[2025673] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/03/2017 12:44 PM]
149
05/03/2017
ARGUMENT CD, sent to Daniel Wenner, TRANSMITTED.[2026277] [14-2902] [Entered: 05/03/2017 04:42 PM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.