United States of America v. Litvak
Court Docket Sheet

2017-01464 (ca2)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 251 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/03/2017
NOTICE OF CRIMINAL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. [2028087] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/05/2017 01:13 PM]
2
05/03/2017
DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/26/2017, RECEIVED.[2028092] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/05/2017 01:15 PM]
3
05/03/2017
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2028093] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/05/2017 01:16 PM]
5
05/05/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 05/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2028492] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/05/2017 04:30 PM]
6
05/05/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Francis for Appellee United States of America, in case 17-1464, [5], ADDED.[2028539] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/05/2017 04:58 PM]
7
05/05/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 05/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2028545] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/05/2017 05:02 PM]
8
05/05/2017
ATTORNEY, Heather Cherry II for Appellee United States of America, in case 17-1464, [7], ADDED.[2028549] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/05/2017 05:05 PM]
9
05/05/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 05/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2028562] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/05/2017 05:25 PM]
11
05/05/2017
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, district court receipt # CTXH00012436, FILED.[2031578] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/10/2017 11:31 AM]
10
05/08/2017
ATTORNEY, William Nardini for Appellee United States of America, in case 17-1464, [9], ADDED.[2029142] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/08/2017 01:26 PM]
12
05/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 05/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2036686] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/16/2017 04:02 PM]
13
05/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 05/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2036691] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/16/2017 04:04 PM]
14
05/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Kannon K. Shanmugam, [12], in place of attorney Adam Harber, SUBSTITUTED.[2036741] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/16/2017 04:23 PM]
15
05/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Allison Jones Rushing for Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, in case 17-1464, [13], ADDED.[2036750] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/16/2017 04:25 PM]
16
05/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 05/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2036881] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/16/2017 05:45 PM]
18
05/25/2017
FORM B, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 05/25/2017 by CM/ECF.[2043795] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/25/2017 04:23 PM]
21
05/31/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Tiffany Campbell, ASSIGNED.[2047051] [17-1464] [Entered: 05/31/2017 02:19 PM]
22
06/07/2017
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, informing Court of proposed due date 08/24/2017, RECEIVED. Service date 06/07/2017 by CM/ECF.[2053441] [17-1464] [Entered: 06/07/2017 04:53 PM]
23
06/08/2017
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Jesse C. Litvak Brief due date as 08/24/2017. Joint Appendix due date as 08/24/2017, FILED.[2053670] [17-1464] [Entered: 06/08/2017 09:46 AM]
24
06/30/2017
MOTION, for bail, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 06/30/2017 by CM/ECF. [2070435] [17-1464] [Entered: 06/30/2017 04:30 PM]
28
07/06/2017
MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 07/06/2017 by CM/ECF. [2072257] [17-1464] [Entered: 07/06/2017 02:36 PM]
33
07/17/2017
OPPOSITION TO, for bail [24], on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 07/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2080463] [17-1464] [Entered: 07/17/2017 06:01 PM]
38
07/24/2017
REPLY TO OPPOSITION [33], on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 07/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2084819][38] [17-1464] [Entered: 07/24/2017 03:59 PM]
41
08/10/2017
SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2097895] [17-1464] [Entered: 08/10/2017 03:04 PM]
42
08/11/2017
SEALED PRE-SENTENCE REPORT, ADDENDUMS TO PSR, AMENDED PSR's and SOR on behalf of, Jesse C. Litvak RECEIVED.[2098556] [17-1464] [Entered: 08/11/2017 11:37 AM]
46
08/22/2017
MOTION ORDER, denying motion for bail [24] filed by Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, The appeal is hereby expedited by JMW, JAC,RR, FILED. [2107493][46] [17-1464] [Entered: 08/22/2017 02:47 PM]
47
08/22/2017
EXPEDITED SCHEDULING ORDER re: Appellee Brief due date as 10/10/2017, Appellant reply brief due date as 10/24/2017 FILED.[2107504] [17-1464] [Entered: 08/22/2017 02:57 PM]
50
08/23/2017
MOTION ORDER, denying motion to extend time to file opposition to Appellant's motion for bail pending appeal as moot [28] filed by Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. [2108313][50] [17-1464] [Entered: 08/23/2017 11:33 AM]
51
08/24/2017
BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by 3rd party, CM/ECF. [2109781] [17-1464] [Entered: 08/24/2017 05:16 PM]
52
08/24/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 6, (pp. 1-288), on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[2109789] [17-1464] [Entered: 08/24/2017 05:27 PM]
53
08/24/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 6, (pp. 289-576), on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[2109792] [17-1464] [Entered: 08/24/2017 05:28 PM]
54
08/24/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 6, (pp. 577-864), on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[2109796] [17-1464] [Entered: 08/24/2017 05:30 PM]
55
08/24/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 6, (pp. 865-1152), on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[2109799] [17-1464] [Entered: 08/24/2017 05:32 PM]
56
08/24/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 6, (pp. 1153-1440), on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[2109800] [17-1464] [Entered: 08/24/2017 05:33 PM]
57
08/24/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 6, (pp. 1441-1518), on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[2109802] [17-1464] [Entered: 08/24/2017 05:35 PM]
58
08/25/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 08/25/2017 by CM/ECF. [2109911] [17-1464] [Entered: 08/25/2017 09:15 AM]
59
08/25/2017
ATTORNEY, Masha Hansford for Jesse C. Litvak, in case 17-1464, [58], ADDED.[2110027] [17-1464] [Entered: 08/25/2017 10:13 AM]
66
10/03/2017
CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 12/11/2017, Panel A, PROPOSED.[2139166] [17-1464] [Entered: 10/03/2017 03:45 PM]
67
10/10/2017
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 10/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2143544] [17-1464] [Entered: 10/10/2017 02:37 PM]
71
10/18/2017
CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 12/11/2017, A Panel, SET.[2150152] [17-1464] [Entered: 10/18/2017 09:59 AM]
72
10/20/2017
ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2152750] [17-1464] [Entered: 10/20/2017 11:34 AM]
73
10/24/2017
REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 10/24/2017 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2155673] [17-1464] [Entered: 10/24/2017 04:49 PM]
74
10/24/2017
MOTION, to file supplemental appendix, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 10/24/2017 by CM/ECF. [2155689] [17-1464] [Entered: 10/24/2017 04:56 PM]
79
10/26/2017
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file supplemental appendix. The supplemental appendix must be filed within seven days of the date of this order [74] filed by Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. [2157629][79] [17-1464] [Entered: 10/26/2017 02:50 PM]
80
10/26/2017
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Kannon K. Shanmugam, Esq. for Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 10/26/2017 by CM/ECF. [2158026] [17-1464] [Entered: 10/26/2017 10:31 PM]
81
10/27/2017
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Jonathan Francis for Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 10/27/2017 by CM/ECF. [2158190] [17-1464] [Entered: 10/27/2017 09:35 AM]
82
10/27/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Oral Argument Statement (Notice of Hearing Date Acknowledgment), [80], on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED.[2158793] [17-1464] [Entered: 10/27/2017 02:13 PM]
83
10/27/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Oral Argument Statement (Notice of Hearing Date Acknowledgment), [81], on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED.[2158841] [17-1464] [Entered: 10/27/2017 02:37 PM]
84
10/27/2017
SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 10/27/2017 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2159047] [17-1464] [Entered: 10/27/2017 03:57 PM]
85
10/30/2017
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED. Service date 10/30/2017 by CM/ECF. [2159554] [17-1464] [Entered: 10/30/2017 10:57 AM]
86
10/30/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE Oral Argument Statement (Notice of Hearing Date Acknowledgment), [80], on behalf of Appellant Jesse C. Litvak, FILED.[2160193] [17-1464] [Entered: 10/30/2017 04:18 PM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.