United States of America v. Phattey
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00247 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
18
06/04/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
19
06/05/2018
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee
06/07/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
06/15/2018
Stay
06/24/2018
Order on Motion to Stay (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
07/16/2018
Summary Judgment
24
07/16/2018
Memorandum
25
08/06/2018
Summary Judgment
26
08/20/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
27
09/04/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
28
09/10/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
29
09/12/2018
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
09/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
09/25/2018
Additional Related Document
10/02/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
10/03/2018
Judgment
10/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.