United States of America v. Robinson
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cv-00015 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/08/2018
Complaint
2
11/08/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
11/08/2018
Unissued Summons
11/08/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
11/27/2018
Order
5
01/02/2019
Order
6
01/03/2019
Status Report
7
01/04/2019
Order
8
01/28/2019
Certificate of Service
9
01/31/2019
Order
10
02/04/2019
Answer to Complaint
11
02/05/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order
12
02/26/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
13
02/28/2019
Scheduling Order
14
03/01/2019
Scheduling Order
15
03/06/2019
Order
16
04/08/2019
Response to Order
17
04/24/2019
Order
18
05/13/2019
ORDER re 16 question regarding jury trial or bench trial. The defendant is not entitled to a jury trial. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 5/13/19.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.