United States of America v. Wales West LLC
Court Docket Sheet

1:2009-cv-00029 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 508 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/16/2009
COMPLAINT against Wales West LLC (IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2009: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet).
2
01/21/2009
NOTICE by United States of America re 1 Complaint Notice of Request for Waiver of Service of Summons
3
01/21/2009
Service Order entered 1/21/2009. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 3/9/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/21/09.
4
02/20/2009
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Wales West LLC waiver sent on 1/16/2009, answer due 3/17/2009.
5
03/16/2009
NOTICE of Appearance by Hilary L. Martinson on behalf of United States of America
6
03/20/2009
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against Wales West LLC.
1
Exhibit Exh. 1 through 5, incl affidavit
1 Attachment
7
03/24/2009
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wales West LLC.
8
04/07/2009
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 7 Answer to Complaint by Wales West LLC.
9
04/10/2009
ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Doc. 8). Plaintiff's counsel has confirmed that Plaintiff's application for Entry of Default(Doc. 6) is Moot as Defendant's Answer (Doc. 7) has been filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/10/2009.
10
04/16/2009
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. Consent Form due by 6/1/2009. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2009: # 1 consent).
11
04/16/2009
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/16/09.
12
04/29/2009
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Joint Report of Parties.
05/06/2009
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 5/13/2009 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/13/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Telephone Conference held on 5/13/2009 with counsel to discuss Rule 26(f) report. Modified on 5/13/2009. (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
05/13/2009
RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2010 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2009. Discovery cutoff 11/6/2009. Dispositive motions due by 12/4/2009. Jury Selection set for 5/4/2010 08:45 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Trial set during the May, 2010 trial term; Position Regarding Settlement due by 11/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/13/09.
1
Pretrial order
1 Attachment
14
05/26/2009
NOTICE of Appearance by Gary A. Moore on behalf of United States of America
15
06/04/2009
This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins and is now assigned to the docket of Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade; To ensure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-B after the case number on all future pleadings.
16
06/05/2009
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2010 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade. Pretrial disclosures to be filed on or before 4/30/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/5/09. (copy mailed to Attny Poggi on 6/5/09) (tot) Modified on 6/5/2009
17
06/12/2009
Order, RESCHEDULING jury trial for the June 2010 civil trial term. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 06/12/2009. (Attachment: #(1) Judge Granade's New Standing Pretrial Order)
18
06/12/2009
Order, Wales West LLC is hereby ORDERED to file its disclosure statement on or before June 19, 2009, or SHOW CAUSE by that date why it is not able to comply with Local Rule 3.4. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 06/12/2009. (Attachment: #(1) blank disclosure statement form)
19
06/17/2009
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Wales West LLC.
20
06/18/2009
Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement 19 filed by Wales West LLC
21
06/19/2009
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 19), filed by Wales West LLC.
22
10/02/2009
Notice of Filing Plaintiff United States' Second Requests for Production to Defendant Wales West LLC filed by United States of America.
23
11/06/2009
STATUS REPORT Joint Report of Parties by United States of America.
24
11/13/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held on November 13, 2009, before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: A status conference was conducted, via telephone, with counsel for the parties to discuss the parties' Joint Status Report (Doc. 23).
25
11/13/2009
Order, Settlement Conference set for 12/3/2009 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Confidential settlement statements due to chambers as set out in order by 5:00 PM on 12/1/2009. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended to 12/18/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/13/2009.
12/03/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Settlement Conference held on 12/3/2009. (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
12/17/2009
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by United States of America.
1
Text of Proposed Order Regarding Motion to File Excess Pages
1 Attachment
27
12/18/2009
ENDORSED ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff may file a Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment not to exceed thirty-six (36) pages. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/18/2009.
28
12/18/2009
MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States of America.
1
Text of Proposed Order Suggested Determinations of Undisputed Fact and Conclusions of Law, with Proposed Order
1 Attachment
29
12/18/2009
Brief filed by United States of America re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America.
1
Appendix Appendix to Plaintiff's Memo in Support of Summary Judgment
1 Attachment
31
12/21/2009
ORDER, Unless the plaintiff can show cause, on or before December 28, 2009, why the 30 exhibits should be sealed, said exhibits will be unsealed. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/21/2009.
32
12/21/2009
Order re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment setting response time as follows: Response to S/J due by 1/8/2010. Reply to Response to S/J due by 1/22/2010. Motion to be taken under submission on 1/25/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/21/2009.
33
12/22/2009
Cause Showing and MOTION to File Under Seal by United States of America.
34
12/23/2009
ENDORSED ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to File 30 Unredacted Appendix of Supporting Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/23/2009.
35
01/06/2010
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Wales West LLC.
36
01/07/2010
ENDORSED ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/15/2010; Replies due by 1/29/2010. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/1/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 01/07/2010.
37
01/15/2010
Joint MOTION for Consent Decree by United States of America, Wales West LLC.
38
01/19/2010
CONSENT DECREE re: 37 Motion with terms of agreement as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/19/2010. Copies to parties.
39
01/31/2012
NOTICE by United States of America re 38 Order on Motion for Consent Decree of Satisfaction of Monetary Relief and Penalty
40
01/18/2013
Joint MOTION for Consent Decree (Extend & Amend) by United States of America, Wales West LLC.
1
Text of Proposed Order - Amendment to Consent Decree
1 Attachment
41
01/18/2013
AMENDMENT TO 38 CONSENT DECREE, after review & consideration of the matters presented in the 40 Joint MOTION to Extend & Amend the Consent Decree, entry of this Amendment is in the best interest of justice, & provisions are to added & shall supplement the original 38 Consent Decree. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/18/2013.
42
11/27/2013
NOTICE by United States of America of Substitution of Counsel
43
06/23/2016
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America.
06/24/2016
REFERRAL OF 43 Joint MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Granade. (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
06/27/2016
ORDER, GRANTING 38 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/27/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.