Urena v. Schindler Elevator Corporation et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cv-00223 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
100
06/05/2018
Stipulation
101
06/05/2018
Order on Stipulation
102
08/17/2018
In Limine
103
08/17/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
104
08/17/2018
Notice (Other)
105
08/17/2018
Notice (Other)
106
08/17/2018
Notice (Other)
107
08/17/2018
Notice (Other)
108
08/17/2018
Notice (Other)
109
08/17/2018
Notice (Other)
110
08/17/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
08/20/2018
Docket Annotation re no Proposed Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
111
08/17/2018
In Limine
112
08/17/2018
Notice (Other)
113
08/17/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
114
08/17/2018
In Limine
115
08/17/2018
In Limine
116
08/17/2018
In Limine
117
08/17/2018
In Limine
118
08/17/2018
In Limine
119
08/17/2018
Partial Summary Judgment
120
08/20/2018
Notice (Other)
08/21/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
121
08/20/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
124
09/10/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
125
09/21/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
126
09/21/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
127
09/21/2018
Notice (Other)
128
09/21/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
129
09/21/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
130
09/21/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
131
09/21/2018
Affidavit
132
09/21/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
133
09/21/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
134
09/21/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
135
09/21/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
136
09/21/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
137
09/26/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
138
09/26/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
139
10/05/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
140
10/05/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
141
10/05/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
142
10/05/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
143
10/05/2018
Affidavit
144
10/05/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
145
10/05/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
146
10/05/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
147
10/05/2018
Strike
148
10/11/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
149
10/12/2018
Hearing
150
10/18/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
151
01/02/2019
Order on Motion for Hearing
152
01/08/2019
Order
153
01/14/2019
Order
154
01/15/2019
Notice (Other)
01/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
156
01/15/2019
Order
01/16/2019
Order Reassigning Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
159
01/22/2019
Notice (Other)
01/30/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
161
01/31/2019
Notice (Other)
02/11/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
163
02/27/2019
Transcript
164
03/03/2019
ORDER denying without prejudice 103 Renewed Motion for Ruling as to Matters of Law Applying to Case - Res Ipsa Loquitor ; granting 110 Motion to Certify Questions of State Law to the Alaska Supreme Court; denying without prejudice 113 Motion for Ruling as to Matter of Law Applying to Case Common Carrier Standard of Care to Defendants. The court's order certifying the question to the Alaska Supreme Court will follow. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/3/19. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
166
03/24/2019
Order on Motion in Limine
167
03/24/2019
Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
05/09/2019
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
169
05/10/2019
Status Report

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.