Valdez v. Department of Justice et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00055 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
07/10/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
6
07/20/2018
Reconsideration
7
10/04/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
8
10/05/2018
Order
9
10/05/2018
Judgment
10
10/17/2018
Notice of Appeal
11
10/22/2018
USCA Case Number
12
10/22/2018
USCA Scheduling Order
13
10/29/2018
USCA Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.