Valerie Catherine Jones
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00318 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/21/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
09/21/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
3
09/21/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
4
09/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
09/21/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
09/21/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/21/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
7
09/22/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
8
09/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
09/24/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
09/25/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
09/25/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
09/25/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
14
09/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
15
09/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
16
09/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10/01/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
10/01/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
10/18/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
11/02/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
19
11/19/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
20
11/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.