Valerie S. Rossow
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00288 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/31/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
08/31/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
3
08/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
08/31/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
08/31/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
08/31/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
6
09/01/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
09/04/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
09/04/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
8
09/04/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
9
09/04/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
10
09/04/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
16
09/26/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10/02/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
10/09/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)
10/09/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
10/09/2018
Certificate of Service
10/10/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/30/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
20
11/02/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
21
11/05/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
22
11/05/2018
Certificate of Service
23
12/04/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
24
12/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
25
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
01/09/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
01/29/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
27
01/29/2019
Certificate of Service
28
01/29/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
29
02/01/2019
Proceeding Memo
30
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
31
02/26/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
32
02/26/2019
Certificate of Service
03/06/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
03/22/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.