Van v. LLR, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00197 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/05/2018
Complaint
2
09/05/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
4
09/13/2018
Amended Complaint
5
09/13/2018
Affidavit of Service
6
09/13/2018
Affidavit of Service
7
09/17/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
8
09/17/2018
Jury Demand
9
09/19/2018
Order
10
09/26/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
11
09/26/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
12
09/26/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
13
09/26/2018
Notice of Appearance
14
09/26/2018
Notice of Appearance
09/27/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
09/26/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
19
09/27/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
20
09/27/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
21
10/18/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
22
10/18/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
10/19/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
10/24/2018
Notice (Other)
26
10/26/2018
Dismiss
27
10/26/2018
Declaration
28
10/26/2018
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
10/29/2018
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
11/15/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
31
11/19/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
32
11/19/2018
Statement
33
11/20/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
34
11/21/2018
Order
35
11/26/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
36
11/26/2018
Declaration
37
11/26/2018
Declaration
38
11/28/2018
Notice (Other)
39
11/29/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
40
12/06/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
41
12/17/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
42
12/17/2018
Notice (Other)
43
12/18/2018
Hearing
44
12/18/2018
Hearing
45
12/26/2018
Notice (Other)
46
01/04/2019
Order on Motion for Hearing
47
01/07/2019
Order on Motion to Dismiss
48
02/04/2019
Order
02/28/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
02/28/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
51
03/01/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
52
03/01/2019
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 3/1/19.
53
03/04/2019
Judgment
54
03/07/2019
Transcript
55
03/18/2019
Attorney Fees
56
03/18/2019
Declaration
57
03/18/2019
Declaration
58
03/21/2019
Attorney Fees
59
03/26/2019
Notice of Appeal
60
03/26/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
61
03/27/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
62
03/28/2019
USCA Case Number
63
03/28/2019
USCA Scheduling Order
64
04/02/2019
Order
65
04/04/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
66
04/15/2019
Order
67
04/22/2019
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
68
05/02/2019
ORDER denying 55 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 5/2/19.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.