Vanessa Avery
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-05185 (alnb)

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[18] Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/24/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-05185-DSC Vanessa Avery Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: lstubblef Page 1 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jan 22, 2018 Form ID: van002 Total Noticed: 24 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jan 24, 2018. db +Vanessa Avery, 820 7th Street Southwst, Birmingham, AL 35214 9578524 +CAPITAL ONE, PO BOX 30285, SALT LAKE CITY UT 84130-0285 9578525 +CARRIE AVERY, 820 7TH STREET SW, BIRMINGHAM AL 35211-1748 9578527 +CONTINENTAL FINANCE CO, 121 CONTINENTAL DR #108, NEWARK DE 19713-4347 9578531 +GULFCO OF AL LLC/TOWER LOAN, % DUMAS & MCPHAIL, PO BOX 870, MOBILE AL 36601-0870 9578533 +REFLEX/CFC, PO BOX 31292, TAMPA FL 33631-3292 9578534 REGIONAL FINANCE, 306 PALISADES BOULEVARD, SUITE 4, JASPER AL 35501 9591284 +REGIONAL MANAGEMENT COPORATION, 979 BATESVILLE RD, SUITE B,, GREER SC 29651-6819 9578535 +REGIONAL MANAGEMENT CORP, 979 BATESVILLE ROAD, SUITE B, GREER SC 29651-6819 9578539 ++TOWER LOAN, P O BOX 320001, FLOWOOD MS 39232-0001 (address filed with court: TOWER LOAN, 406 LIBERTY PARK COURT, FLOWOOD MS 39232) 9578538 +TOWER LOAN, PO BOX 361583, BIRMINGHAM AL 35236-1583 9578540 +WELLS FARGO BANK, PO BOX 5058, MAC P6053-021, PORTLAND OR 97208-5058 9578541 +WELLS FARGO BANK OVERDRAFT, RECOVERY PAYMENT PRO DEPT, PO BOX 63491 MAC A0143-042, SAN FRANCISCO CA 94163-0001 9578542 +WELLS FARGO DEALER SERVICES, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 19657, IRVINE CA 92623-9657 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. 9578522 +E-mail/Text: g17768@att.com Jan 23 2018 01:41:14 AT&T SERVICES INC, ONE AT&T WAY ROOM 3A104, BEDMINSTER NJ 07921-2694 9578523 +E-mail/Text: bknotice@erccollections.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:48 AT&T UVERSE, % ENHANCED RECOVERY CORP, 8014 BAYBERRY RD, JACKSONVILLE FL 32256-7412 9578526 +Fax: 614-760-4092 Jan 23 2018 01:57:40 COMMUNITY CHOICE FINANCIAL, FDBA EASY MONEY, 6785 BOBCAT WAY SUITE 200, DUBLIN OH 43016-1443 9578529 +E-mail/Text: bk@creditcentralllc.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:31 CREDIT CENTRAL, 700 E NORTH ST STE 15, GREENVILLE SC 29601-3013 9578528 +E-mail/Text: bk@creditcentralllc.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:31 CREDIT CENTRAL, 267 WEST VALLEY AVENUE, HOMEWOOD AL 35209-4817 9578530 +Fax: 614-760-4092 Jan 23 2018 01:57:40 EASY MONEY, 2168 GREEN SPRINGS HIGHWAY, BIRMINGHAM AL 35205-6808 9578532 E-mail/PDF: cbp@onemainfinancial.com Jan 23 2018 01:38:31 OneMain, PO Box 3251, Evansville, IN 47731-3251 9578536 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@republicfinance.com Jan 23 2018 01:44:01 REPUBLIC FINANCE, 1845 MONTGOMERY HIGHWAY, BIRMINGHAM AL 35244-2501 9578537 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@republicfinance.com Jan 23 2018 01:44:02 REPUBLIC FINANCE BANKRUPTCY, 1140 ROMA AVENUE, HAMMOND LA 70403 9589232 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@republicfinance.com Jan 23 2018 01:44:02 Republic Finance LLC, 1140 Roma Ave, Hammond, LA 70403 TOTAL: 10 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '++' were redirected to the recipient's preferred mailing address pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 342(f)/Fed.R.Bank.PR.2002(g)(4). I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jan 24, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on January 22, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Botes on behalf of Debtor Vanessa Avery pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort3@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Case 17-05185-DSC13 Doc 19 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 3 District/off: 1126-2 User: lstubblef Page 2 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jan 22, 2018 Form ID: van002 Total Noticed: 24 The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system (continued) TOTAL: 2 Case 17-05185-DSC13 Doc 19 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 3 Van−002 [Notice of Hearing] (Rev. 05/14) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−05185−DSC13 Vanessa Avery Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−4564 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF HEARING Notice is hereby given that a hearing will be held to consider and act upon the following: 17 − Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul) Date: Tuesday, February 13, 2018 Time: 11:00 AM Location: Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 1, Birmingham, AL 35203 Attorneys should attend all scheduled hearings. If a conflict is known, the Court should be notified immediately. Continuances of non−evidentiary hearings may be granted if all parties consent. Evidentiary hearings will not be continued except for good cause shown. If there is a failure to attend a scheduled hearing, and the Court has not been notified of the reason for the failure, the Court may enter appropriate orders. Attendance is not required if a settlement has been reached as approved by all parties and filed with the Court by an attorney prior to the hearing date. Dated: January 22, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court dls Case 17-05185-DSC13 Doc 19 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 3

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 266 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/07/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Vanessa Avery
2
12/07/2017
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Vanessa Avery.
3
12/07/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Vanessa Avery
5
12/07/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Vanessa Avery.
6
12/07/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Vanessa Avery.
7
12/07/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Vanessa Avery.
8
12/07/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Vanessa Avery.
9
12/07/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/10/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 02/13/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/15/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/05/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 03/12/2018.
12/08/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Vanessa Avery Case Number 02-07721, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/30/2002, Standard Discharge on 08/11/2006; Case Number 99-03144, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/27/1999, Standard Discharge on 07/17/2001.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
12/08/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Vanessa Avery).
11
12/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 12/09/2017.
12
12/10/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Vanessa Avery). Notice Date 12/10/2017.
13
12/08/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
14
12/13/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 13 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 12/13/2017.
15
12/19/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
16
01/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 1/10/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
17
01/19/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
18
01/22/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 2/13/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
19
01/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[18] Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/24/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.