Varner v. Shoreside Petroleum, inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00189 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/15/2018
Notice of Removal
2
08/15/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
08/15/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
4
08/27/2018
Notice of Service List
5
08/27/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
6
08/27/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
7
08/29/2018
Answer to Complaint
8
09/20/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
9
09/28/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
10
10/15/2018
Witness List
11
10/27/2018
Witness List
12
01/28/2019
Order
13
04/30/2019
Witness List
14
05/21/2019
Witness List

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.