Venecia Miller
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2016-bk-03845 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 304 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/20/2016
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Venecia Miller
2
09/20/2016
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Venecia Miller.
3
09/20/2016
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Venecia Miller
5
09/20/2016
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Venecia Miller.
6
09/20/2016
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Venecia Miller.
7
09/20/2016
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Venecia Miller.
8
09/20/2016
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/26/2016 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/15/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 01/24/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 03/20/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 12/27/2016.
9
09/20/2016
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Venecia Miller).
10
09/21/2016
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
09/21/2016
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Recovery Management Systems Corporation.
09/21/2016
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Venecia Miller Case Number 11-03240, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/27/2011, Standard Discharge on 10/12/2011.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
09/22/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 09/22/2016.
13
09/22/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Venecia Miller). Notice Date 09/22/2016.
14
09/23/2016
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
15
09/23/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 09/23/2016.
16
09/30/2016
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC.
17
10/14/2016
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial.
18
10/26/2016
Meeting of Creditors Held 10/26/2016. (Ch13troffice, jc)
19
10/31/2016
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
20
11/01/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 19 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 11/15/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (TOM) Birmingham.
21
11/03/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/03/2016.
22
11/06/2016
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Venecia Miller.
23
11/06/2016
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Venecia Miller.
24
11/07/2016
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
25
11/16/2016
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/15/2016 12:05:38 PM ]. File Size [ 238 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:40 ]. (RE: Doc #19; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case (Insufficient Notice Time)). (adiuser).
26
11/17/2016
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing.
27
11/28/2016
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. Trustees Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed on 11/28/2016 (RE: related document(s) 19 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 22 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Venecia Miller).
28
11/30/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 11/30/2016.
29
12/02/2016
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
12/27/2016
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 232.50 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2016
Receipt of Payment of Fee(16-03845-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (232.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20179545. Fee Amount 232.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(16-03845-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20254006. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
03/18/2017
Motion to Approve Compromise Filed by Debtor Venecia Miller
31
03/18/2017
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 4 of Americredit in the amount of $24,321.71 Filed by Debtor Venecia Miller.
32
03/20/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 31 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Venecia Miller). Hearing scheduled 4/20/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
34
03/21/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 30 Motion to Approve Compromise filed by Debtor Venecia Miller). Hearing scheduled 4/20/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
35
03/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 32 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 03/22/2017.
36
03/23/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 03/23/2017.
37
04/20/2017
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/20/2017 10:09:13 AM ]. File Size [ 569 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:35 ]. (RE: Doc #30; Motion to Approve Compromise between Debtor and State Farm Insurance). (adiuser).
38
04/28/2017
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 4 Signed on 4/28/2017 (RE: related document(s) 30 Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed by Debtor Venecia Miller, 31 Overruling Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Venecia Miller).
39
04/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 38 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 04/30/2017.
40
05/10/2017
LetterInsurance premium due for 2014 Chevrolet Cruze; Insurance period 9/27/16 through 2/13/17 Filed by Creditor Priority Insurance Agency Insurance.
41
01/18/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, Filed by Creditor PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
1
Note #
2
Mortgage
2 Attachments
42
01/18/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (RE: related document(s) 41 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay,).
01/18/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(16-03845-TOM13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21618995. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 41) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
01/19/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay and Co-Debtor Stay filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (RE: related document(s) 41 Motion for Relief from Stay and Co-Debtor Stay, filed by Creditor PennyMac Loan Services, LLC). Hearing scheduled 2/8/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
45
01/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 43 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 01/21/2018.
46
02/09/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/8/2018 10:35:00 AM ]. File Size [ 563 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:34 ]. (RE: Doc #41; Motion for Relief from Stay and Co-Debtor Stay Filed by Thomas Tutten, Attorney for PennyMac Loan Services, LLC). (adiuser).
47
02/12/2018
Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay and Co-Debtor Stay (Related Doc # 41) Signed on 2/12/2018.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.