Veronica Steele
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01502 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 239 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
1
04/06/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Veronica Steele
2
04/06/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Veronica Steele.
4
04/06/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Veronica Steele.
5
04/06/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Veronica Steele.
04/06/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01502-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21928756. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
04/06/2018
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Veronica Steele.
7
04/06/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Veronica Steele.
8
04/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/16/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 06/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/15/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/03/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/16/2018.
9
04/07/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
10
04/07/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
11
04/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/08/2018.
04/09/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Veronica Steele Case Number 09-02981, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/19/2009, Standard Discharge on 08/19/2009.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
04/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/11/2018.
13
04/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Veronica Steele). Notice Date 04/11/2018.
14
04/13/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
15
05/15/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
16
05/16/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 5/16/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
17
05/22/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
18
05/23/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
19
05/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/25/2018.
20
06/06/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Veronica Steele (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Veronica Steele.).
21
07/09/2018
Amended Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
22
07/11/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. The Trustees Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn. Signed on 7/11/2018 (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 20 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Veronica Steele).
23
07/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 07/13/2018.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.