Vick v. Social Security Administration
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Arkansas

4:2016-cv-00046 (ared)

ORDER ADOPTING [13] Recommended Disposition. The Commissioner's decision is affirmed, and Plaintiff Courtney Vick's [2] Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/12/2016.

Case 4:16-cv-00046-JM Document 14 Filed 10/12/16 Page 1 of 1 IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT EASTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS WESTERN DIVISION COURTNEY VICK PLAINTIFF V. NO. 4:16CV00046-JM-JTR CAROLYN W. COLVIN, DEFENDANT Acting Commissioner, Social Security Administration ORDER The Court has reviewed the Recommended Disposition submitted by United States Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray. No objections have been filed. After careful consideration, the Court concludes that the Recommended Disposition should be, and hereby is, approved and adopted in its entirety as this Court’s findings in all respects. Judgment will be entered accordingly. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT the Commissioner’s decision is AFFIRMED, and Plaintiff Courtney Vick’s Complaint (Doc. 2) is DISMISSED with prejudice. DATED this 12th day of October, 2016. _____________________________________ UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE

JUDGMENT Consistent with the [14] Order entered this day, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment is entered in favor of the Commissioner. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/12/2016.

Case 4:16-cv-00046-JM Document 15 Filed 10/12/16 Page 1 of 1 IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT EASTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS WESTERN DIVISION COURTNEY VICK PLAINTIFF V. NO. 4:16CV00046-JM-JTR CAROLYN W. COLVIN, DEFENDANT Acting Commissioner, Social Security Administration JUDGMENT Consistent with the Order that was entered on this day, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Judgment is entered in favor of the Commissioner. DATED this 12th day of October, 2016. ___________________________________ UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 754 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/29/2016
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Courtney Vick.
2
01/29/2016
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Courtney Vick.
1
https://ecf.ared.uscourts.gov/doc1/02713715401" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02713715401','102590','10','','2','0','',''}};">1</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
1 Attachment
3
02/12/2016
ORDER granting 1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and directing the Clerk to file and docket the Complaint, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor, and issue summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/12/2016.
02/12/2016
Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to plaintiff's counsel for service. (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
05/06/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Una McGeehan on behalf of Social Security Administration
5
05/06/2016
ANSWER to 2 Complaint by Social Security Administration.
6
05/06/2016
NOTICE by Social Security Administration
7
05/09/2016
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re 5 Answer to Complaint and 6 Notice (Other). Document received in paper and maintained in the Clerk's office. (Documents w/restricted access added on 5/9/2016).
8
05/10/2016
SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Brief is due by 6/21/2016. Defendant must file a Brief within 42 days of the date Plaintiff's Brief is served. Signed at the direction of the Court on 5/10/2016.
9
06/14/2016
First MOTION to Extend Time by Courtney Vick
10
06/21/2016
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF filed by Courtney Vick. Defendant Brief due by 8/5/2016
11
07/07/2016
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF filed by Social Security Administration.
12
07/08/2016
ORDER denying as moot 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/8/2016.
13
09/23/2016
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION there is substantial evidence to support the Commissioner's decision that Vick only had two severe impairments; he did not err in concluding bipolar disorder was not a severe impairment; the finding that Vick was not disabled within the meaning of the Social Security Act, therefore must be and is affirmed; the case should be dismissed with prejudice [2]; Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/23/16.
14
10/12/2016
ORDER ADOPTING [13] Recommended Disposition. The Commissioner's decision is affirmed, and Plaintiff Courtney Vick's [2] Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/12/2016.
15
10/12/2016
JUDGMENT Consistent with the [14] Order entered this day, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment is entered in favor of the Commissioner. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/12/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.