Victor R Arnold
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00536 (alnb)

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[10] Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 02/14/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 18-00536-TOM Victor R Arnold Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: admin Page 1 of 1 Date Rcvd: Feb 12, 2018 Form ID: def005 Total Noticed: 1 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 14, 2018. db +Victor R Arnold, 1213 Princeton Ave SW, Birmingham, AL 35211-1524 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. NONE. TOTAL: 0 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 14, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 10, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Victor R Arnold brent@brentwdavis.com, bwdllcmyecfmail@gmail.com;brentwdavisassociatesllc@gmail.com;r41804@notify.bestcase.com TOTAL: 2 Case 18-00536-TOM13 Doc 13 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 2 Def−005 [Notice to File Certification] (Rev. 12/15) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 18−00536−TOM13 Victor R Arnold Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−9102 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE A CERTIFICATION ABOUT A FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT COURSE (Official Form 423) Notice is hereby given that, subject to limited exceptions, a Debtor must complete an instructional course in personal financial management in order to receive a discharge under chapter 7 (11 U.S.C. § 727) or chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. § 1328). Generally, financial course providers will file a certificate with the Court to indicate that the Debtor has completed the course. If the course provider fails to file the certificate, a Debtor must complete and file Certification About a Financial Management Course (Official Form 423) pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1007(b)(7). If Rule 1007(b)(7) requires a Debtor to file Official Form 423 and a Debtor fails to do so, the Court will not enter a discharge and will close the case. If a Debtor subsequently files a Motion to Reopen the Case to allow for the filing of the Official Form 423, the full reopening fee must be paid for filing the motion, and the fee cannot be waived. Depending on the circumstances, the Court may order the Debtor's attorney to pay the reopening fee instead of the Debtor. Dated: February 10, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court Case 18-00536-TOM13 Doc 13 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 248 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/09/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Victor R Arnold
2
02/09/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Victor R Arnold.
3
02/09/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Victor R Arnold
5
02/09/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Victor R Arnold.
6
02/09/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Victor R Arnold.
7
02/09/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Victor R Arnold.
8
02/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/14/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 04/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 04/20/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 08/08/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 05/14/2018.
9
02/09/2018
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Victor R Arnold).
10
02/10/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
11
02/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 02/11/2018.
12
02/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Victor R Arnold). Notice Date 02/11/2018.
13
02/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[10] Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 02/14/2018.
34
06/08/2018
Withdrawal
38
06/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.