Viking Constructors, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00126 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
112
07/06/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
113
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
114
08/02/2018
Proceeding Memo
115
08/02/2018
Proceeding Memo
116
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
117
08/21/2018
Case Status Report
118
08/21/2018
Case Status Report
119
08/21/2018
Generic Motion / Application
120
08/27/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
121
08/28/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
122
08/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
123
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
09/10/2018
Close BK Case Utility (See Final Decree for Regular BK Closings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.