Wagoner v. Williams et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00211 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/20/2018
Complaint
2
09/20/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
09/20/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
4
09/20/2018
Appoint Counsel
5
09/20/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA 23
03/07/2019
Docket Annotation - Public Officer-Agency (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/20/2018
Unissued Summons
7
03/27/2019
Order
8
03/28/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
9
03/28/2019
Order
10
04/17/2019
Notice of Appearance
04/18/2019
Filing Fee Received (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
04/29/2019
Answer to Complaint
12
05/20/2019
Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.