Waits v. Hess et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00111 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
08/08/2018
Service by Publication
6
08/08/2018
Affidavit
08/30/2018
Order on Motion for Service by Publication (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
08/31/2018
Order
9
09/11/2018
Notice (Other)
09/20/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
10/15/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
10/31/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
11/09/2018
Service by Publication
13
12/26/2018
Order
14
01/09/2019
Default Judgment
15
01/09/2019
Affidavit
01/09/2019
Docket Annotation re Incomplete/Unreadable PDF (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
01/09/2019
Errata
01/11/2019
Order Referring Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/11/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
01/14/2019
Notice (Other)
19
01/14/2019
Order
20
01/28/2019
Default Judgment
21
01/28/2019
Memorandum
02/27/2019
Motions Referred (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
03/27/2019
Report and Recommendation - (NO Final R&R to Issue)
25
04/18/2019
Order
04/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
05/02/2019
Notice (Other)
05/02/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
05/02/2019
Notice of Appearance
05/03/2019
Evidentiary Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
05/03/2019
Notice of Appearance
32
05/10/2019
Transcript

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.