Walker v. Alaskan Dream Fisheries, LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00048 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
14
06/08/2018
Answer to Complaint
15
06/12/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
16
06/29/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
17
07/31/2018
Scheduling Order
18
10/02/2018
Notice of Change of Address
19
10/02/2018
Notice of Change of Address
20
11/16/2018
Compel
21
11/16/2018
Memorandum
22
11/16/2018
Certificate of Counsel
23
11/29/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
12/06/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
12/13/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
26
12/14/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
27
12/28/2018
Notice (Other)
12/31/2018
Order on Motion to Compel (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
01/02/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
30
01/03/2019
Order
31
02/19/2019
Compel
32
02/19/2019
Memorandum
33
02/19/2019
Notice (Other)
34
03/05/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
35
03/05/2019
Declaration
36
03/05/2019
Declaration
37
03/12/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
38
04/11/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
39
04/12/2019
Order
40
05/24/2019
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.