Walker v. Food Giant, et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2001-cv-00454 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 663 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/13/2001
ANSWER to Cmplt by Food Giant, Piggly Wiggly (Atty Herman Cobb), referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson h(hc) Modified on 04/19/2001
2
04/13/2001
NTC of Filing of Ntc of Removal by Food Giant, Piggly Wiggly, referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson h
3
04/13/2001
AMENDED ANSWER to Cmplt by Food Giant, Piggly Wiggly: Amends [1-1] Answer by Piggly Wiggly, Food Giant, referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson h
04/19/2001
File referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson h (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
04/20/2001
ORDER that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discoveryplan shall be filed by 5/4/01 Planning Meeting report due on 5/4/01 (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided; furn: sc.
5
05/04/2001
REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting. Referred to Judge Thompson.
6
05/08/2001
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 1/30/02 before Judge Myron H. Thompson; setting Motion Filing deadline on 11/1/01 ; setting Discovery cutoff 2/4/02 ; jury trial set for 3/4/02 before Judge Myron H. Thompson ; setting amended pleading deadline for 8/31/01; setting Mediation Notice deadline on 11/22/01 (AO Form 85 attached) (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel. Furnished to YG, HC, SC, JURY
06/12/2001
REFERRAL JUDGE reassigned to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2001
REFERRAL JUDGE reassigned to Mag. Judge Delores R. Boyd (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/30/2001
MOTION by Food Giant, Piggly Wiggly for Summary Judgment (Exhibit A attached) referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
8
10/30/2001
BRIEF by Food Giant, Piggly Wiggly in support of [7-1] motion for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
9
11/02/2001
ORDERED that the [7-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Piggly Wiggly, Food Giant is set for submission, without oral argument, on 11/16/01 with the plaintiff to file her brief and evidentiary materials by said date. (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
10
11/16/2001
BRIEF by Hattie Mae Walker in opposition to [7-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson (sl) Modified on 11/19/2001
11
11/16/2001
EVIDENTIARY SUBMISSION by Hattie Mae Walker in opposition to [7-1] motion for Summary Judgment (exhibits 1-14 attached) Referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson. (sl) Modified on 11/19/2001
12
12/06/2001
ORDER resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 11:00 1/30/02 in chambers in Montgomery before Judge Myron H. Thompson ; Proposed Pretrial Order due 1/28/02 ; Jury Trial set for 3/4/02 trial term in Montgomery before Judge Myron H. Thompson (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel; furnished to YG, HC, WAR, SC.
13
12/21/2001
ORDER resettin Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury Trial set for term of court beginning 4/1/02 before Judge Myron H. Thompson as further set out in order ; proposed jury instructions due on 3/18/02; voir dire questions due 3/18/02 (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel. Furnished to YG, HC,SC, JURY (sl) Modified on 12/21/2001
12/21/2001
Deadline updated per order 12/21/01; setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury selection set for 4/1/02 (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
01/15/2002
OPINION; A separate judgment will be entered. (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel. Furnished to YG, HC, WAR, SC
15
01/15/2002
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Food Giant, Piggly Wiggly against Hattie Mae Walker with plaintiff Walker taking nothing by her complaint; granting [7-1] motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendants Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc. and Piggly Wiggly; taxing costs against plaintiff Walker, for which execution may issue (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel. Furnished to YG, HC, WAR, SC
01/15/2002
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.