Walter L. Tartt
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-82059 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
52
11/03/2018
Debtor Objection to Claim
71
12/13/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
75
12/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
84
02/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
85
02/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
86
02/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
88
03/05/2019
Limit Notice
90
03/06/2019
Motion to Modify Plan

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.