Walter Norise Burton
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01596 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 175 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Dismiss Case - Other
doc
05/24/2018
Trustee Objection to Confirmation of Plan
doc
05/25/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
1
04/12/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Walter Norise Burton
2
04/12/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Walter Norise Burton.
4
04/12/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Walter Norise Burton.
5
04/12/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Walter Norise Burton.
6
04/12/2018
Affidavit regarding tax returns Filed by Debtor Walter Norise Burton.
04/12/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01596-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21953108. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
04/12/2018
Supplemental Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 3015-1(c) Filed by Debtor Walter Norise Burton (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan).
8
04/12/2018
Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Filed by Debtor Walter Norise Burton
9
04/13/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
04/13/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Walter Norise Burton Case Number 14-02206, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/04/2014, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 01/21/2016; Case Number 16-00507, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/12/2016, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 03/21/2018.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
04/13/2018
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Walter Norise Burton.
11
04/13/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
12
04/13/2018
Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 07-06, dated April 19, 2007, and Rule 9029 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, authorizing this Court to establish and promulgate local rules of practice and procedure not inconsistent with the Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, and subject to the requirements of Rule 83 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that: 1. Any case filed by the same Debtor within 12 months of the date of entry of an Order of dismissal or of discharge of a prior case, shall be assigned to the same Judge from the prior case. 2. Any case filed by the same Debtor within 12 months of the date of closing a prior case, shall be assigned to the same Judge from the prior case. 3. Any case filed by a debtor that already has a case pending, shall be assigned to the same judge as the pending case. 4. If any such case has been assigned either by the random or by the automatic Judge assignment and is inconsistent with Administrative Order No. 07-06, the Clerk's office shall reassign the case consistent with said Administrative Order.Judge Tamara O Mitchell added to case. Involvement of Judge D. Sims Crawford Terminated
13
04/13/2018
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/16/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 7/16/2018.Proofs of Claims due by 6/21/2018.Government Proof of Claim due by 10/9/2018.Confirmation hearing to be held on 6/21/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
14
04/13/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 8 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Walter Norise Burton). Hearing scheduled 5/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
15
04/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 13 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 04/15/2018.
16
04/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/15/2018.
17
04/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Walter Norise Burton). Notice Date 04/15/2018.
18
04/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 14 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/15/2018.
19
04/24/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jonathan Mancil Smothers Filed by Creditor Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Servicer for U. S. Bank National Association as trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank National Association, as trustee for Aegis Asset Backed Securities Trust Mortg.
20
04/27/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
21
05/10/2018
ORDER Granting Signed on 05/10/2018 RE: Doc #8; Debtor's Motion to Extend Automatic Stay.
22
05/10/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/10/2018 10:37:30 AM ]. File Size [ 184 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:31 ]. (RE: Doc #8; Debtor's Motion to Extend Automatic Stay). (adiuser).
23
05/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Order Granting). Notice Date 05/12/2018.
24
05/16/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 5/16/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
25
05/24/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
26
05/25/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 25 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/21/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/27/2018.
28
06/22/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/21/2018 11:32:09 AM ]. File Size [ 221 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:37 ]. (RE: Doc #25; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
29
06/25/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 6/25/2018 (RE: related document(s) 13 Confirmation Hearing, 25 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/12/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
30
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 29 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/27/2018.
31
06/29/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Walter Norise Burton (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Walter Norise Burton.).
32
06/29/2018
Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses Filed by Debtor Walter Norise Burton.
33
07/13/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
39
09/29/2018
Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee Motion to Dismiss
10/01/2018
Hearing Scheduled (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
12/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.