Wanda Faye Hayes
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-03963 (alnb)

Document

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE:) CHAPTER 13 WANDA FAYE HAYES)) CASE NO. 17-03963-TOM-13 Debtor(s).) NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF AUTOMATIC STAY Now Comes, NICHOLAS FINANCIAL, INC., a creditor herein, by its attorneys, Chambless Math ˜ Carr, P.C., pursuant to the Conditional Order Terminating Stay previously entered by this Court and hereby gives notice that the automatic stay provided by 11 U.S.C. § 362(a) has terminated pursuant to terms of that order. NICHOLAS FINANCIAL, INC. By: /s/ Leonard N. Math Attorney for the Creditor Of Counsel: Chambless Math ˜ Carr, P.C. P.O. Box 230759 Montgomery, Alabama 36123-0759 334-272-2230 lmath@chambless-math.com Case 17-03963-TOM13 Doc 48 Filed 08/01/18 Entered 08/01/18 00:22:55 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE The undersigned certifies that the foregoing instrument was served on all attorneys of record as set forth below on August 1, 2018. Bradford W. Botes Bond, Botes, Reese & Shinn, PC 600 University Park Place Suite 510 Birmingham, AL 35209 205-802-2200 205-802-2209 (fax) ecfbirmingham@bondnbotes.com Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee P O Box 10848 Birmingham, AL 35202-0848 205 323-4631 ctmail@ch13bham.com WANDA FAYE HAYES 413 ROBERTS STREET CHATTANOOGA TN 37404 /s/ Leonard N. Math Chambless Math ˜ Carr, P.C. 2 Case 17-03963-TOM13 Doc 48 Filed 08/01/18 Entered 08/01/18 00:22:55 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 83 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/14/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Wanda Faye Hayes
2
09/14/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Wanda Faye Hayes.
4
09/14/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/18/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/16/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 01/16/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 03/13/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 12/18/2017.
5
09/14/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Wanda Faye Hayes.
6
09/14/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Wanda Faye Hayes.
09/14/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-03963-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21159792. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
09/14/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Wanda Faye Hayes.
8
09/14/2017
Motion to Determine Value of 2008 Ford Focus financed by Nicholas Financial, Inc. Filed by Debtor Wanda Faye Hayes
9
09/15/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
09/15/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 8 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor Wanda Faye Hayes). Hearing scheduled 11/16/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
11
09/15/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
12
09/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 4 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 09/16/2017.
13
09/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Wanda Faye Hayes). Notice Date 09/17/2017.
14
09/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 09/17/2017.
15
09/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/17/2017.
16
09/18/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
17
09/25/2017
Ex Parte Motion to Redact ECF Proof of Claim 003 Fee Amount $25 Filed by Creditor Nicholas Financial, Inc.
09/25/2017
Receipt of Motion to Redact(17-03963-TOM13) [motion,mredact] (25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21200596. Fee Amount 25.00 (re:Doc# 17) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
09/25/2017
Notice and Order Granting Motion to Redact (Related Doc # 17) Signed on 9/25/2017.
19
09/27/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Order on Motion to Redact). Notice Date 09/27/2017.
20
10/13/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor NICHOLAS FINANCIAL, INC.
1
Affidavit #
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
21
10/13/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor NICHOLAS FINANCIAL, INC. (RE: related document(s) 20 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
10/13/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-03963-TOM13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21279285. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 20) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
10/16/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Nicholas Financial Inc. (RE: related document(s) 20 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor NICHOLAS FINANCIAL, INC.). Hearing scheduled 11/2/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
24
10/18/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 10/18/2017.
25
10/19/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 10/18/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc)
26
10/20/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
27
10/23/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 26 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 11/16/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
28
10/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 10/25/2017.
29
11/01/2017
Courtroom Deputy Notes (Based on agreement of the parties, this matter is settled; Katherine Luders to submit a separate order.) RE: Doc #20; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Leonard N. Math, Attorney for Nicholas Financial Inc.
30
11/15/2017
Order on Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 20) Signed on 11/15/2017.
31
11/16/2017
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/16/2017 11:40:23 AM ]. File Size [ 363 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:01 ]. (RE: Doc #8; Debtor's Motion to Determine Value - 2008 Ford Focus - Nicholas Financial, Inc.). (adiuser).
32
11/16/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Wanda Faye Hayes.
33
11/17/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing; Motion to Determine Value of Collateral is Granted. Signed on 11/17/2017 (RE: related document(s) 4 Confirmation Hearing, 8 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor Wanda Faye Hayes, 26 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 12/14/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
34
11/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 11/17/2017.
35
11/19/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 33 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/19/2017.
36
12/18/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
37
01/24/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are Withdrawn. Signed on 1/24/2018 (RE: related document(s) 26 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 32 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Wanda Faye Hayes).
38
01/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 01/26/2018.
39
02/09/2018
Amended Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are Withdrawn. Signed on 2/9/2018 (RE: related document(s) 26 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 32 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Wanda Faye Hayes).
40
02/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 39 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 02/11/2018.
41
03/29/2018
Trustee's Objection to Claim # 8 of Alabama Power in the amount of $491.17 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, kc)
42
03/30/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 41 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway). Hearing scheduled 5/10/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
43
04/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 42 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/01/2018.
44
05/10/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/10/2018 9:59:24 AM ]. File Size [ 142 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:24 ]. (RE: Doc #41; Trustee's Objection to Claim # 8 of Alabama Power in the amount of $491.17). (adiuser).
45
05/16/2018
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 8 Signed on 5/16/2018 (RE: related document(s) 41 Sustaining Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway).
46
05/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 45 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 05/18/2018.
47
07/11/2018
Notice of Continuing Default.
48
08/01/2018
Document
55
09/26/2018
Modify Plan
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.