Wardell v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00187 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
45
06/01/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
46
06/29/2018
Stipulation
47
07/02/2018
Order on Stipulation
48
07/10/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
07/16/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
09/05/2018
Stipulation
09/12/2018
Order on Stipulation (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
10/26/2018
Quash
53
11/12/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
11/19/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
11/21/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
56
11/28/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
57
12/03/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
12/06/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
12/07/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
60
12/11/2018
Hearing
12/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
12/13/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
12/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
12/13/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
12/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
02/07/2019
Order on Motion to Quash
02/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
03/11/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
03/12/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
04/05/2019
Additional Related Document
73
04/08/2019
Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.